This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/07/2020 at 10:49:52 (UTC).

Mehl v. Smith et al

Case Summary

On 07/09/2020 Mehl filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Smith. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sylvia H. Rambo and EB. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01173

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sylvia H. Rambo

Referral Judge

EB

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ryan Mehl

Huntingdon, PA 16652

Defendants

Corrections Luetenan Smith

Corrections Captain Eichenlab

John Does 1 and 2

Smith

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Jessica S. Davis

Attorney at Office of Attorney General

15Th Floor, Strawberry Square

Harrisburg, PA 17120

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit(s)

#2

#3

#4

#5

5 #1

IFP (civil rights)

#6

#7

RESTRICTED

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

#13

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketReceipt of payment from RYAN MEHL in the amount of $45.00 for PLRA CIVIL FILING FEE. Transaction posted on 9/2/2020. Receipt number 333072815 processed by aoswald. (jjs) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Eichenlab, Smith. Eichenlab waiver sent on 8/25/2020, answer due 10/26/2020; Smith waiver sent on 8/25/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (Davis, Jessica) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica S. Davis on behalf of Eichenlab, Smith (Davis, Jessica) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER denying pltf's mtn to appoint cnsl #10 .Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 7/24/20. (ma) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Ryan Mehl.(cl) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Waiver of Service forms (AO 398 and 399) Mailed to Eichenlab, Smith Waiver of Service due by 8/19/2020. (ma) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER: 1. Pltfs mtns for leave to proceed ifp #2 and #6 are GRANTED;2. Pltf shall pay the full filing fee of $350.00 based on the financial information provided in the application to proceed ifp. The full filing fee shall be paid regardless of the outcome of the litigation;3. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1) and (2), the Superintendent/Warden, or other appropriate official at Pltfs place of confinement is directed to deduct fees as directed in this order.4. The Clerk of Court is directed to SEND a copy of this Order to the Superintendent/Warden of the institution wherein Pltf is presently confined;5. The complaint (Doc. No. 1) is DEEMED filed;6. The Clerk of Court is directed to SERVE a copy of the complaint (Doc. No. 1), notice of lawsuit and request to waive service of summons (form AO 398), waiver of the service of summons (form AO 399), and this Order on Dfts.; and7. If service is unable to be completed due to Pltfs failure to properly name the Dfts or provide an accurate mailing address for the Dfts, Pltf will be required to correct this deficiency. Failure to comply may result in the dismissal of Pltfs claims against the Dfts pursuant to FRCP 4(m).Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 7/20/20. (ma) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement for Ryan Mehl. (ao) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION (Application) for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, including certification, by Ryan Mehl.(ao) Modified on 7/21/2020 (lp). (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 07/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP (civil rights))(lp) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (no further attachments - new form used, 398 and 399 forms filled out, etc) (lg) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) U.S. MARSHAL - 285, AO 398 and AO 399 Service Forms Completed by Plaintiff. (lg) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION/application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ryan Mehl.(lg) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants lodged pending the disposition of the Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Ryan Mehl. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(lg) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SMITH is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jessica S. Davis Esq.