This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2020 at 13:43:15 (UTC).

Meeks v. Nutramax Laboratories Veterinary Sciences, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/15/2019 Meeks filed a Property - Personal Property Product Liability lawsuit against Nutramax Laboratories Veterinary Sciences, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Montana District. The Judge overseeing this case is Dana L. Christensen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:19-CV-00088

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Montana District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dana L. Christensen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michelle Meeks

Defendants and Cross Defendants

iPROMOTEu, Inc.

Nutramax Laboratories Veterinary Sciences, Inc.

John Does 1-10

Jack Vaughn

Jack Vaughn doing business as Winning Images, Inc.

Nutramax Laboratories Veterinary Sciences, Inc. doing business as Dasuquin

Defendant and Cross Claimant

Nutramax Laboratories Veterinary Sciences, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jory C. Ruggiero

Attorney at WESTERN JUSTICE ASSOCIATES

303 West Mendenhall, Suite 1

Bozeman, MT 59715

Maxwell E. Kirchhoff

Attorney at WESTERN JUSTICE ASSOCIATES

303 West Mendenhall, Suite 1

Bozeman, MT 59715

Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorneys

Thomas Hollo

Attorney at HAMMER, QUINN & SHAW, PLLC

100 Financial Drive, Suite 100, Po Box 7310

Kalispell, MT 59904-0310

Todd A. Hammer

Attorney at HAMMER, QUINN & SHAW, PLLC

100 Financial Drive, Suite 100, Po Box 7310

Kalispell, MT 59904-0310

Marcel A. Quinn

Attorney at HAMMER, QUINN & SHAW, PLLC

100 Financial Drive, Suite 100, Po Box 7310

Kalispell, MT 59904-0310

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) Disclosure Statement by Nutramax Laboratories Veterinary Sciences, Inc.. (Hammer, Todd) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

#5

(#5) Defendant Nutramax Laboratory Sciences, Inc. ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against John Does 1-10, Jack Vaughn, iPROMOTEu, Inc. by Nutramax Laboratories Veterinary Sciences, Inc.. (Hammer, Todd) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

#4

(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Jack Vaughn d/b/a Winning Images, Inc on June 19, 2019, filed by Michelle Meeks. (Kirchhoff, Maxwell) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Jack Vaughn. Original mailed to WJA. (ASG) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

#2

(#2) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on iPROMOTEu, Inc. on May 2, 2019, filed by Michelle Meeks. (Kirchhoff, Maxwell) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

1 #5

civil cover sheet

1 #4

Ex D - NOR to State Court

1 #3

Ex C - Acknowledgment and Waiver

1 #2

Ex B - Summons

1 #1

Ex A - Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nutramax Laboratories Veterinary Sciences, Inc. from Montana Fourth Judicial District Court, case number DV-32-2019-0000367-DS. (Attachments: #1 Ex A - Complaint, #2 Ex B - Summons, #3 Ex C - Acknowledgment and Waiver, #4 Ex D - NOR to State Court, #5 civil cover sheet) (ASG) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Disclosure Statement by Nutramax Laboratories Veterinary Sciences, Inc.. (Hammer, Todd) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Defendant Nutramax Laboratory Sciences, Inc. ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against John Does 1-10, Jack Vaughn, iPROMOTEu, Inc. by Nutramax Laboratories Veterinary Sciences, Inc.. (Hammer, Todd) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Jack Vaughn d/b/a Winning Images, Inc on June 19, 2019, filed by Michelle Meeks. (Kirchhoff, Maxwell) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Jack Vaughn. Original mailed to WJA. (ASG) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on iPROMOTEu, Inc. on May 2, 2019, filed by Michelle Meeks. (Kirchhoff, Maxwell) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • Filing fee: $400.00 paid, receipt number 0977-2309742. (ASG) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nutramax Laboratories Veterinary Sciences, Inc. from Montana Fourth Judicial District Court, case number DV-32-2019-0000367-DS. (Attachments: #1 Ex A - Complaint, #2 Ex B - Summons, #3 Ex C - Acknowledgment and Waiver, #4 Ex D - NOR to State Court, #5 civil cover sheet) (ASG) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less