This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/15/2019 at 09:05:49 (UTC).

MEEKER v. MCFADDEN et al

Case Summary

On 10/16/2019 MEEKER filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against MCFADDEN. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-04840

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAMUEL S. MEEKER

Allentown, PA 18102

Defendants

DEPUTY WARDEN MCFADDEN

MEGAN PANCOWISC

SGT. ZUBAR

LEHIGH COUNTY

OFFICER REGER

SGT. KOWAL

ANTHONY M. CHICKEN-FUCKER MUIR, ESQ.

LT. DALLY

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ORDER THAT MEEKER'S CASE IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO PAY THE REQUIRED FEES AND COSTS. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO CLOSE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 12/4/19. 12/4/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF.(er, ) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER THAT MEEKER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS DENIED BECAUSE IT APPEARS FROM THE MOTION THAT MEEKER IS ABLE TO PAY THE FEES AND COSTS OF FILING SUIT. MEEKER MAY PROCEED BY SUBMITTING $400 (THE $350 FILING FEE AND $50 ADMINISTRATIVE FEE) TO THE CLERK OF COURT WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. IF MEEKER FAILS TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER, THIS CASE MAY BE DISMISSED WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE FOR FAILURE TO PAY THE FILING FEES AND COSTS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 10/23/19.10/23/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF.(er, ) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

#5

(#5) PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (amas) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

#4

(#4) MOTION FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL, FILED BY SAMUEL S. MEEKER.(amas) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

#3

RESTRICTED

2 #1

Designation Form , CASE MANAGEMENT TRACK FORM

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against DALLY, KOWAL, LEHIGH COUNTY, MCFADDEN, ANTHONY M. "CHICKE MUIR, ESQ., MEGAN PANCOWISC, REGER, ZUBAR, filed by SAMUEL S. MEEKER. (Attachments: #1 Designation Form, CASE MANAGEMENT TRACK FORM)(amas) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

#1

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER THAT MEEKER'S CASE IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO PAY THE REQUIRED FEES AND COSTS. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO CLOSE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 12/4/19. 12/4/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF.(er, ) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER THAT MEEKER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS DENIED BECAUSE IT APPEARS FROM THE MOTION THAT MEEKER IS ABLE TO PAY THE FEES AND COSTS OF FILING SUIT. MEEKER MAY PROCEED BY SUBMITTING $400 (THE $350 FILING FEE AND $50 ADMINISTRATIVE FEE) TO THE CLERK OF COURT WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. IF MEEKER FAILS TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER, THIS CASE MAY BE DISMISSED WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE FOR FAILURE TO PAY THE FILING FEES AND COSTS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 10/23/19.10/23/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF.(er, ) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (amas) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL, FILED BY SAMUEL S. MEEKER.(amas) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by SAMUEL S. MEEKER. (amas) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against DALLY, KOWAL, LEHIGH COUNTY, MCFADDEN, ANTHONY M. "CHICKE MUIR, ESQ., MEGAN PANCOWISC, REGER, ZUBAR, filed by SAMUEL S. MEEKER. (Attachments: #1 Designation Form, CASE MANAGEMENT TRACK FORM)(amas) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by SAMUEL S. MEEKER.(amas) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LEHIGH COUNTY is a litigant