Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/04/2021 at 07:41:47 (UTC).

Medtronic, Inc. et al v. Walland, Jr.

Case Summary

On 04/05/2021 Medtronic, Inc filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against Walland, Jr. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Edgardo Ramos. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02908

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Edgardo Ramos

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Medtronic, Inc.

Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA, Inc.

Medtronic Sofamor Danek, Inc.

Medicrea USA, Corp.

Defendants

Joseph F. Walland

Joseph F. Walland, Jr.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James Wilson Perkins

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP (NYC)

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Adam Kirschbaum

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP (NY)

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Eric Bruce Sigda

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

John T. Duffey

Attorney at Maslon LLP

90 South Seventh Street, Ste 3300

Minneapolis, MN 55402

William Z. Pentelovitch

Attorney at Maslon, Edelman, Borman & Brand, L.L.P.

3300 Norwest Center, 90 South Seventh Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402-4140

Peter C. Hennigan

Attorney at Maslon LLP

3300 Wells Fargo Center, 90 South Seventh Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Defendant Attorneys

Brie Kluytenaar

Attorney at Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky & Popeo, P.C.(NYC)

666 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Andrew Jay Bernstein

Attorney at Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky & Popeo, P.C.(NYC)

666 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10017

 

Court Documents

#38

(#38) SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #11 EMERGENCY MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . . Document filed by Medicrea USA, Corp., Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA, Inc., Medtronic Sofamor Danek, Inc., Medtronic, Inc...(Pentelovitch, William) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

#37

(#37) ORDER granting #36 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. Plaintiffs' request is granted. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion. Doc. 36. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 4/16/2021) (cf) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

#32

(#32) REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #11 EMERGENCY MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . . Document filed by Medicrea USA, Corp., Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA, Inc., Medtronic Sofamor Danek, Inc., Medtronic, Inc...(Perkins, James) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

#26

No Description Available

#24

No Description Available

#23

No Description Available

#9

No Description Available

#8

No Description Available

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Kirschbaum on behalf of Medicrea USA, Corp., Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA, Inc., Medtronic Sofamor Danek, Inc., Medtronic, Inc...(Kirschbaum, Adam) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Wilson Perkins on behalf of Medicrea USA, Corp., Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA, Inc., Medtronic Sofamor Danek, Inc., Medtronic, Inc...(Perkins, James) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #11 EMERGENCY MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . . Document filed by Medicrea USA, Corp., Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA, Inc., Medtronic Sofamor Danek, Inc., Medtronic, Inc...(Pentelovitch, William) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) ORDER granting #36 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. Plaintiffs' request is granted. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion. Doc. 36. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 4/16/2021) (cf) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Argument re Def's 04/15/21 choice of law briefing re Pls' emergency app for preliminary injunction addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from William Z. Pentelovitch dated April 16, 2021. Document filed by Medicrea USA, Corp., Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA, Inc., Medtronic Sofamor Danek, Inc., Medtronic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment).(Pentelovitch, William) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #11 EMERGENCY MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . . Document filed by Joseph F. Walland, Jr...(Bernstein, Andrew) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edgardo Ramos: Show Cause Hearing held on 4/14/2021. Plaintiff's and Defendant's counsel present. The application for preliminary injunction and temporary restraining order has been taken under advisement. Defendant's additional briefing is due April 15, 2021. (jar) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) DECLARATION of Peter C. Hennigan in Support re: #11 EMERGENCY MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order .. Document filed by Medicrea USA, Corp., Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA, Inc., Medtronic Sofamor Danek, Inc., Medtronic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Walland's Linked In Profile using JPEG format using Snip & Sketch, #2 Exhibit B - Walland's Linked In Profile using auto-generated application).(Perkins, James) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) ORDER granting #22 Motion for Peter C. Hennigan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #22 MOTION for Peter C. Hennigan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for #22 MOTION for Peter C. Hennigan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Filing fee $ 200.00. Pay.gov receipt number BNYSDC-24378433, paid on 4/9/2021. (aea) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #11 EMERGENCY MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . . Document filed by Medicrea USA, Corp., Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA, Inc., Medtronic Sofamor Danek, Inc., Medtronic, Inc...(Perkins, James) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney James Wilson Perkins to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): incorrect citizenship for the plaintiff. (pc) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney James Wilson Perkins. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jurisdiction code 3 (Federal Question); Citizenship Plaintiff code 7 (NONE); Citizenship Defendant code 7 (NONE); County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jurisdiction code has been modified to 4 (Diversity); the Citizenship Plaintiff code has been modified to 2 (Citizen of Another State); the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 2 (Citizen of Another State); the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (pc) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney James Wilson Perkins. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Joseph F. Walland. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (pc) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eric Bruce Sigda on behalf of Medicrea USA, Corp., Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA, Inc., Medtronic Sofamor Danek, Inc., Medtronic, Inc...(Sigda, Eric) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Kirschbaum on behalf of Medicrea USA, Corp., Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA, Inc., Medtronic Sofamor Danek, Inc., Medtronic, Inc...(Kirschbaum, Adam) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Wilson Perkins on behalf of Medicrea USA, Corp., Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA, Inc., Medtronic Sofamor Danek, Inc., Medtronic, Inc...(Perkins, James) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Medtronic plc for Medicrea USA, Corp., Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA, Inc., Medtronic Sofamor Danek, Inc., Medtronic, Inc.. Document filed by Medicrea USA, Corp., Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA, Inc., Medtronic Sofamor Danek, Inc., Medtronic, Inc...(Perkins, James) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Joseph F. Walland, Jr., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Medicrea USA, Corp., Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA, Inc., Medtronic Sofamor Danek, Inc., Medtronic, Inc...(Perkins, James) Modified on 4/6/2021 (pc). (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Perkins, James) Modified on 4/6/2021 (pc). (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Joseph F. Walland. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24354707)Document filed by Medtronic, Inc., Medicrea USA, Corp., Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA, Inc., Medtronic Sofamor Danek, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Employment Agreement, #2 Exhibit B- Separation Agreement, #3 Exhibit C- March 30, 2021, Email, #4 Exhibit D- Spreadsheet 1, #5 Exhibit E- Spreadsheet 2, #6 Exhibit F- March 31, 2021 Email, #7 Exhibit G- April 2, 2021 Letter, #8 Exhibit H- Cease and Desist 1, #9 Exhibit I- Cease and Desist 2).(Perkins, James) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Medtronic, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANDREW J. BERNSTEIN