This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/26/2023 at 07:10:40 (UTC).

Medrano et al v. Marriott International, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/28/2022 Medrano filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Marriott International, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Sallie Kim. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-09134

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sallie Kim

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Emilio Medrano

Antonio Molina

Defendants

Marriott International, Inc.

Ritz-Calton Hotel Company, LLC doing business as Ritz-Carlton Half Moon Bay

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sharon Rachel Vinick

Brittany Wightman Shamma

Wendy Ellen Musell

Defendant Attorneys

Jesse D. Sutz

Monte K. Grix

Benjamin Joseph Herold

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

3 #3

Main Document

3 #1

Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint

3 #2

Exhibit B - Answer to Complaint

3 #3

Exhibit C - Notice to State Court of Removal to Federal Court

#4

(#4) Declaration of Courtney Bleakley in Support of #1 Notice of Removal, by Marriott International, Inc., Ritz-Calton Hotel Company, LLC dba Ritz-Carlton Half Moon Bay. (Herold, Benjamin) (Filed on 12/28/2022) Modified text on 12/29/2022 (dhm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/28/2022)

#5

(#5) Declaration of Lisa Krone in Support of #1 Notice of Removal, by Marriott International, Inc., Ritz-Calton Hotel Company, LLC dba Ritz-Carlton Half Moon Bay. (Herold, Benjamin) (Filed on 12/28/2022) Modified text on 12/29/2022 (dhm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/28/2022)

#6

(#6) Certificate of Interested Entities by Marriott International, Inc., Ritz-Calton Hotel Company, LLC dba Ritz-Carlton Half Moon Bay re #1 Notice of Removal, Defendants' Notice of Interested Parties (Herold, Benjamin) (Filed on 12/28/2022) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

#7

(#7) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 4/3/2023 . Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/10/2023 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2022) (Entered: 12/29/2022)

#8

(#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Marriott International, Inc., Ritz-Calton Hotel Company, LLC.. (Sutz, Jesse) (Filed on 1/11/2023) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

#9

(#9) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 1/27/2023. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 1/27/2023. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2023) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

#10

(#10) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Emilio Medrano.. (Musell, Wendy) (Filed on 1/13/2023) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Emilio Medrano.. (Musell, Wendy) (Filed on 1/13/2023) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 1/27/2023. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 1/27/2023. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2023) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Marriott International, Inc., Ritz-Calton Hotel Company, LLC.. (Sutz, Jesse) (Filed on 1/11/2023) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #3 Affidavit, filed by Ritz-Calton Hotel Company, LLC, Marriott International, Inc., #4 Affidavit, filed by Ritz-Calton Hotel Company, LLC, Marriott International, Inc., #5 Affidavit, filed by Ritz-Calton Hotel Company, LLC, Marriott International, Inc. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2022) (Entered: 12/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 4/3/2023 . Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/10/2023 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2022) (Entered: 12/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certificate of Interested Entities by Marriott International, Inc., Ritz-Calton Hotel Company, LLC dba Ritz-Carlton Half Moon Bay re #1 Notice of Removal, Defendants' Notice of Interested Parties (Herold, Benjamin) (Filed on 12/28/2022) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Declaration of Lisa Krone in Support of #1 Notice of Removal, by Marriott International, Inc., Ritz-Calton Hotel Company, LLC dba Ritz-Carlton Half Moon Bay. (Herold, Benjamin) (Filed on 12/28/2022) Modified text on 12/29/2022 (dhm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Declaration of Courtney Bleakley in Support of #1 Notice of Removal, by Marriott International, Inc., Ritz-Calton Hotel Company, LLC dba Ritz-Carlton Half Moon Bay. (Herold, Benjamin) (Filed on 12/28/2022) Modified text on 12/29/2022 (dhm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Declaration of Benjamin J. Herold re #1 Notice of Removal, by Marriott International, Inc., Ritz-Calton Hotel Company, LLC dba Ritz-Carlton Half Moon Bay. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Answer to Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Notice to State Court of Removal to Federal Court)(Herold, Benjamin) (Filed on 12/28/2022) Modified text on 12/29/2022 (dhm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/11/2023. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2022) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Mateo Superior Court. Their case number is 22-CIV-04848. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ACANDC-17857265). Filed byMarriott International, Inc., Ritz-Calton Hotel Company, LLC dba Ritz-Carlton Half Moon Bay. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Herold, Benjamin) (Filed on 12/28/2022) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less