This case was last updated from PACER on 12/13/2020 at 09:19:23 (UTC).

Medline industries Inc v. Diversey Inc et al

Case Summary

On 10/14/2020 Medline industries Inc filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against Diversey Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Pamela Pepper. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01579

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Pamela Pepper

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Medline industries Inc

Three Lakes Drive

Northfield, IL 60093

Defendants

Peter Melchior

Whitefish Bay, WI 53217

Diversey Inc.

1300 Altura Road, Suite 125

Fort Mill, SC 29708

Diversey Inc

Interested Party

Wypetech, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ralph A Weber

Attorney at Gass Weber Mullins LLC

241 N Broadway - Ste 300

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Stephen T Trigg

Attorney at Gass Weber Mullins LLC

241 N Broadway - Ste 300

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Defendant and Interested Party Attorneys

Matthew W O'Neill

Attorney at Fox O'Neill & Shannon SC

622 N Water St - Ste 500

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Christie B Carrino

Attorney at Godfrey & Kahn SC

833 E Michigan St - Ste 1800

Milwaukee, WI 53202-5615

Anthony S Baish

Attorney at Godfrey & Kahn SC

833 E Michigan St - Ste 1800

Milwaukee, WI 53202-5615

 

Court Documents

#69

(#69) RESPONSE to Motion filed by Diversey Inc re #26 MOTION to Seal Document (Medline Industries, Inc.'s Motion to Seal Proposed Supplemental Brief and Exhibits), #55 MOTION to Restrict Document , #51 MOTION to Restrict Document (Medline Industries, Inc.'s Motion to Seal Medline Industries, Inc.'s Amended Complaint for Injunctive and Other Relief) . (Baish, Anthony)

#68

(#68) RESPONSE to Motion filed by Wypetech, LLC re #60 MOTION to Seal Document , #26 MOTION to Seal Document (Medline Industries, Inc.'s Motion to Seal Proposed Supplemental Brief and Exhibits), #55 MOTION to Restrict Document , #51 MOTION to Restrict Document (Medline Industries, Inc.'s Motion to Seal Medline Industries, Inc.'s Amended Complaint for Injunctive and Other Relief) . (Baish, Anthony)

#67

(#67) NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony S Baish on behalf of Wypetech, LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Anthony S. Baish (Baish, Anthony)

#66

(#66) DECLARATION of Peter Melchior (Baish, Anthony)

#60

(#60) MOTION to Seal Document by Diversey Inc. (Baish, Anthony)

#55

(#68) RESPONSE to Motion filed by Wypetech, LLC re #60 MOTION to Seal Document , #26 MOTION to Seal Document (Medline Industries, Inc.'s Motion to Seal Proposed Supplemental Brief and Exhibits), #55 MOTION to Restrict Document , #51 MOTION to Restrict Document (Medline Industries, Inc.'s Motion to Seal Medline Industries, Inc.'s Amended Complaint for Injunctive and Other Relief) . (Baish, Anthony)

#51

(#68) RESPONSE to Motion filed by Wypetech, LLC re #60 MOTION to Seal Document , #26 MOTION to Seal Document (Medline Industries, Inc.'s Motion to Seal Proposed Supplemental Brief and Exhibits), #55 MOTION to Restrict Document , #51 MOTION to Restrict Document (Medline Industries, Inc.'s Motion to Seal Medline Industries, Inc.'s Amended Complaint for Injunctive and Other Relief) . (Baish, Anthony)

26 #1

Exhibit A

#26

(#68) RESPONSE to Motion filed by Wypetech, LLC re #60 MOTION to Seal Document , #26 MOTION to Seal Document (Medline Industries, Inc.'s Motion to Seal Proposed Supplemental Brief and Exhibits), #55 MOTION to Restrict Document , #51 MOTION to Restrict Document (Medline Industries, Inc.'s Motion to Seal Medline Industries, Inc.'s Amended Complaint for Injunctive and Other Relief) . (Baish, Anthony)

1 #12

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #11

Summons Melchior

1 #10

Summons Diversey

1 #9

Exhibit 6

1 #8

Exhibit 5

1 #7

Exhibit 4

1 #6

Exhibit 3

1 #5

Exhibit 2

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Medline industries Inc by Medline industries Inc. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3603757) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 1A, #3 Exhibit 1B, #4 Exhibit 1C, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Summons Diversey, #11 Summons Melchior, #12 Civil Cover Sheet)(Weber, Ralph)

196 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#69) RESPONSE to Motion filed by Diversey Inc re #26 MOTION to Seal Document (Medline Industries, Inc.'s Motion to Seal Proposed Supplemental Brief and Exhibits), #55 MOTION to Restrict Document , #51 MOTION to Restrict Document (Medline Industries, Inc.'s Motion to Seal Medline Industries, Inc.'s Amended Complaint for Injunctive and Other Relief) . (Baish, Anthony)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#68) RESPONSE to Motion filed by Wypetech, LLC re #60 MOTION to Seal Document , #26 MOTION to Seal Document (Medline Industries, Inc.'s Motion to Seal Proposed Supplemental Brief and Exhibits), #55 MOTION to Restrict Document , #51 MOTION to Restrict Document (Medline Industries, Inc.'s Motion to Seal Medline Industries, Inc.'s Amended Complaint for Injunctive and Other Relief) . (Baish, Anthony)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony S Baish on behalf of Wypetech, LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Anthony S. Baish (Baish, Anthony)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#66) DECLARATION of Peter Melchior (Baish, Anthony)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) DECLARATION of Carolyn Cooke (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)This document and/or certain attachments are restricted to case participants and attorneys of record should use their efiling login and password to view this document(Baish, Anthony)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) DECLARATION of Anthony Baish in Support of Diversey, Inc.'s Opposition to Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunctive Relief (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W, #25 Exhibit X, #26 Exhibit Y, #27 Exhibit Z, #28 Exhibit AA, #29 Exhibit BB)This document and/or certain attachments are restricted to case participants and attorneys of record should use their efiling login and password to view this document(Baish, Anthony)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) BRIEF in Opposition filed by Diversey Inc re #16 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunctive Relief MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Corrected Filing to Restrict to Case Participants). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)This document and/or certain attachments are restricted to case participants and attorneys of record should use their efiling login and password to view this document(Baish, Anthony)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) UNPUBLISHED Decision Index of Unpublished Cases Cited in Diversey, Inc.'s Opposition to Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunctive Relief filed by Diversey Inc (Baish, Anthony)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) BRIEF in Opposition filed by Diversey Inc re #16 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunctive Relief MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)This document and/or certain attachments are SEALED and only viewable by permission of the court(Baish, Anthony)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) MOTION to Seal Document by Diversey Inc. (Baish, Anthony)

    Read MoreRead Less
54 More Docket Entries
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Medline industries Inc (Trigg, Stephen)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Medline industries Inc (Weber, Ralph)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DECLARATION of Ralph A. Weber iso Medline LR 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive Motion for Entry of Confidentiality Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-IL Action Dkt # 36, #2 Exhibit 2-IL Action Dkt # 52, #3 Exhibit 3-IL Action Dkt # 57, #4 Exhibit 4-IL Action Dkt # 111, #5 Exhibit 5-IL Action Dkt # 191)(Weber, Ralph)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION for Protective Order by Medline industries Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proposed Confidentiality Order)(Weber, Ralph)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ADMISSION OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint on 10/21/2020 by Registered Agent for Diversey (Trigg, Stephen)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued as to All Defendants. (asc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketCase Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: The county code has been modified - please remember to choose the county for the first named plaintiff. One or more party names have been modified - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (asc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketNOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge Pamela Pepper; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (cmb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISCLOSURE Statement by Medline industries Inc. (Weber, Ralph)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Medline industries Inc by Medline industries Inc. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3603757) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 1A, #3 Exhibit 1B, #4 Exhibit 1C, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Summons Diversey, #11 Summons Melchior, #12 Civil Cover Sheet)(Weber, Ralph)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DIVERSEY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where MEDLINE INDUSTRIES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anthony S Baish