This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/01/2022 at 05:45:15 (UTC).

Medix Staffing Solutions, Inc. v. Connected Care et al

Case Summary

On 05/14/2020 Medix Staffing Solutions, Inc filed a Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery lawsuit against Connected Care. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Martha M. Pacold. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02899

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Martha M. Pacold

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Medix Staffing Solutions, Inc.

222 S. Riverside Plaza, Suite 2120

Chicago, IL 60606

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Sanjay Patil

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Golden State Medicare Health Plan

2260 University Drive

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Connected Care Health Services, Inc

2260 University Drive

Newport Beach, IL 92660

Excelera Aco, Inc

2260 University Drive

Newport Beach, CA 92660

MacArthur Court Acquisition Corp.

2260 University Drive

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Discovery Genomics, Inc.

2260 University Ave

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Excelera Investment 1 LLC

2260 University Drive

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Connected Care Resources, Inc.

2260 University Drive

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Kenneth Chase

Attorney at Chase Law & Associates, P.A.

1141 71St Street

Miami Beach, FL 33141

Chris Sioukas

Attorney at Medix

222 S. Riverside Plaza, Suite 2120

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#137

(#137) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: The court has reviewed plaintiff's status report. #136 . Plaintiff reports that settlement negotiations have resumed and asks that this case be stayed for 90 days. Accordingly, the motion hearing set for 6/15/2022 is stricken. This case is stayed until 9/8/2022. The parties are directed to file a joint status report by 9/9/2022 informing the court of the status of their settlement negotiations, unless a stipulation of dismissal is filed prior to that date. (rao, ) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

#136

(#136) STATUS Report re Settlement by Medix Staffing Solutions, Inc. (Chase, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

#135

(#135) CERTIFICATE Certificate of Service of #133 and #134 on Defendants' Last Known Address (Chase, Kenneth) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

#134

(#134) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: Plaintiff's counsel is directed to serve a copy of the order setting the hearing for ruling #133 on defendants by 5/27/2022, and file a certificate of service on the docket by 5/31/2022. (rao, ) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

#133

(#133) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: Telephonic ruling on Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment #121 is set for 6/15/2022 at 11:00 a.m. The court will rule on the basis of the parties' filings; no argument is necessary. If there are any developments in the status of the case that the court should be aware of prior to ruling (e.g., settlement; not supplemental briefing on the parties' arguments, which have already been addressed in the briefing on the motion), the parties are directed to file a notice with the court at least 24 hours before the hearing. Dial toll-free call-in number: (888) 684-8852; followed by the conference access code: 9482028#. Audio recording of the hearing is not permitted; violations of this prohibition may result in sanctions deemed necessary by the court. Participants are directed to keep their device muted when they are not speaking. (rao, ) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

121 #3

Declaration Affidavit in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment

121 #2

Supplement LR 56.1 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Plaintif

121 #1

Supplement Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary J

121 #121

Main Document

#7

(#7) ANSWER to amended complaint Answer, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM filed by Golden State Medicare Health Plan, Excelera Aco, Inc, Connected Care Health Services, Inc, Sanjay Patil against Medix Staffing Solutions, Inc. . by Golden State Medicare Health Plan, Excelera Aco, Inc, Connected Care Health Services, Inc, Sanjay Patil(Bell, Donnell) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Exhibit Amendment to Agreement

1 #1

Exhibit Master Services Agreement

#1

134 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#137) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: The court has reviewed plaintiff's status report. #136 . Plaintiff reports that settlement negotiations have resumed and asks that this case be stayed for 90 days. Accordingly, the motion hearing set for 6/15/2022 is stricken. This case is stayed until 9/8/2022. The parties are directed to file a joint status report by 9/9/2022 informing the court of the status of their settlement negotiations, unless a stipulation of dismissal is filed prior to that date. (rao, ) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#136) STATUS Report re Settlement by Medix Staffing Solutions, Inc. (Chase, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#135) CERTIFICATE Certificate of Service of #133 and #134 on Defendants' Last Known Address (Chase, Kenneth) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#134) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: Plaintiff's counsel is directed to serve a copy of the order setting the hearing for ruling #133 on defendants by 5/27/2022, and file a certificate of service on the docket by 5/31/2022. (rao, ) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#133) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: Telephonic ruling on Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment #121 is set for 6/15/2022 at 11:00 a.m. The court will rule on the basis of the parties' filings; no argument is necessary. If there are any developments in the status of the case that the court should be aware of prior to ruling (e.g., settlement; not supplemental briefing on the parties' arguments, which have already been addressed in the briefing on the motion), the parties are directed to file a notice with the court at least 24 hours before the hearing. Dial toll-free call-in number: (888) 684-8852; followed by the conference access code: 9482028#. Audio recording of the hearing is not permitted; violations of this prohibition may result in sanctions deemed necessary by the court. Participants are directed to keep their device muted when they are not speaking. (rao, ) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#132) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: On 4/5/2022, this court granted defendants a final extension of time until 5/2/2022 to find new counsel and file a response to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment. #129 . Defendants have failed to find new counsel and respond to the pending motion for summary judgment. Plaintiff has moved for entry of default. #131 . The motion for entry of default #131 is denied. "When a party moves for summary judgment and the opposing party fails to respond, summary judgment ordinarily cannot be granted by default. Instead, facts are taken as true and it still must be decided if the moving party is entitled to summary judgment based on those facts." Mara Intern. Furniture, LLC v. Village of Hanover Park, No. 05 C 6036, 2008 WL 565510, at *3 (N.D. Ill. Feb. 27, 2008). Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment #121 remains under advisement, and the court will consider the motion unopposed. Briefing on the motion for summary judgment is closed. (rao, ) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#131) MOTION by Plaintiff Medix Staffing Solutions, Inc. for entry of default due to Defendants' Failure to Obtain Counsel and Defend the Case (Chase, Kenneth) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#130) NOTICE by Medix Staffing Solutions, Inc. re other, #126 , MOTION by Plaintiff Medix Staffing Solutions, Inc. for summary judgment #121 , order on motion for extension of time,,,,,, terminate motion and R&R deadlines/hearings,,,,,, set motion and R&R deadlines/hearings,,,,, #129 , text entry,,,,,,, #124 , order on motion to withdraw,, order on motion to withdraw as attorney,,, #127 Notice of Defendants' Non-Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and Corporate Defendants' Failure to Retain Counsel (Chase, Kenneth) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#129) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: Defendants, through their corporate general counsel, filed a motion for an extension of time to find new counsel and file a response to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment #128 . Defendants seek an extension of time up through May 2, 2022 to find new counsel and file a response to plaintiff's motion. Defendants' motion raises concerns about the length of the extension, given the issues discussed at the 2/18/2022 status hearing. Nonetheless, given the time necessary for defendants to obtain new counsel, and for new counsel to get up to speed on the case and prepare the response, the motion #128 is granted. Defendants will be given until 5/2/2022 in which to find new counsel and respond to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment #121 . Plaintiff's reply is due by 5/23/2022. However, given the length of the extension and the concerns the court noted, this will be a final extension. In addition, the parties are reminded to comply with the court's local rules when submitting their briefs and Local Rule 56.1 statements. Failure to comply with the local rules, which facilitate the clear, comprehensible, and efficient presentation of the evidence and arguments, may result in the court striking a non-compliant brief or statement. (rao, ) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#128) MOTION by Defendants Connected Care Health Services, Inc, Excelera Aco, Inc, Golden State Medicare Health Plan, Sanjay Patil for extension of time. (jh, ) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
118 More Docket Entries
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold:The parties are directed to file a joint status report by 8/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Initial Status Report outline) (rao, ) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Connected Care Health Services, Inc, Excelera Aco, Inc, Sanjay Patil, Counter Claimant Golden State Medicare Health Plan by Donnell Joseph Bell (Bell, Donnell) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to amended complaint Answer, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM filed by Golden State Medicare Health Plan, Excelera Aco, Inc, Connected Care Health Services, Inc, Sanjay Patil against Medix Staffing Solutions, Inc. . by Golden State Medicare Health Plan, Excelera Aco, Inc, Connected Care Health Services, Inc, Sanjay Patil(Bell, Donnell) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk9, Docket) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AMENDED complaint by Medix Staffing Solutions, Inc. against All Defendants (Sioukas, Chris) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Medix Staffing Solutions, Inc.. All Defendants. (Sioukas, Chris) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket11, ) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Sioukas, Chris) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Martha M. Pacold. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (txl, ) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT 1:20-cv-02899 Medix Staffing Solutions, Inc. v. Connected Care et al filed by Medix Staffing Solutions, Inc.; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17014111. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Master Services Agreement, #2 Exhibit Amendment to Agreement)(Sioukas, Chris) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Connected Care Resources, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Excelera Investment 1 LLC is a litigant