This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/02/2021 at 07:51:30 (UTC).

MEDINA v. NATIONAL GUARD BUREAU et al

Case Summary

On 11/03/2020 MEDINA filed a Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act lawsuit against NATIONAL GUARD BUREAU. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Emmet G. Sullivan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03178

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Emmet G. Sullivan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THOMAS MEDINA

Defendants

NATIONAL GUARD BUREAU

DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Eric Sebastian Montalvo

Attorney at FEDERAL PRACTICE GROUP WORLDWIDE SERVICE

1750 K Street, Nw, Suite 900

Washington, DC 20006

Defendant Attorney

Paul A. Mussenden

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

555 Fourth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, NATIONAL GUARD BUREAU.(Mussenden, Paul) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Paul A. Mussenden on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, NATIONAL GUARD BUREAU (Mussenden, Paul) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

4 #1

Exhibit 1

#4

(#4) STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 11/17/20. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

3 #1

Notice and Consent

#3

(#3) SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, NATIONAL GUARD BUREAU, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by THOMAS MEDINA filed by THOMAS MEDINA.(Montalvo, Eric) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

1 #5

Summons

1 #4

Summons

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants NATIONAL GUARD BUREAU and DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7793112) filed by THOMAS MEDINA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Montalvo, Eric) Modified on 11/4/2020 to add payment information (zsb). (Entered: 11/03/2020)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketENTERED IN ERROR.....Set/Reset Deadlines: Meet & Confer Report due by 1/8/2021. (mac) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff brings this action pursuant to the Freedom of Information Act (FOIA), 5 U.S.C. 552. The parties are directed to meet and confer and propose a joint scheduling order for further proceedings in this case by no later than January 8, 2021. The parties' joint proposed scheduling order shall address the following: (1) the status of plaintiff's FOIA request; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to plaintiff's FOIA request; (3) the anticipated date(s), if any, for release of documents responsive to plaintiff's FOIA request; (4) whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case; (5) whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case; (6) whether this case would benefit from referral to a magistrate judge or the District Court Mediation Program for purposes of settlement; and (7) a proposed briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if applicable. If the parties are unable to agree on a joint recommendation, the joint proposed scheduling order shall include each party's individual recommendations. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 12/10/2020. (lcegs3) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, NATIONAL GUARD BUREAU.(Mussenden, Paul) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Paul A. Mussenden on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, NATIONAL GUARD BUREAU (Mussenden, Paul) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 11/17/20. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, NATIONAL GUARD BUREAU, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zsb) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by THOMAS MEDINA filed by THOMAS MEDINA.(Montalvo, Eric) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants NATIONAL GUARD BUREAU and DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7793112) filed by THOMAS MEDINA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Montalvo, Eric) Modified on 11/4/2020 to add payment information (zsb). (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where National Guard Bureau is a litigant

Latest cases where Department of the Air Force is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul A. Mussenden