This case was last updated from PACER on 02/02/2020 at 07:50:51 (UTC).

Medina v. Liberty Insurance Corporation

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 Medina filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Liberty Insurance Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is R. Brooke Jackson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03406

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

R. Brooke Jackson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Emily Medina

Defendant

Liberty Insurance Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jonathan Shawn Sar

Attorney at Leventhal Sar LLC

3200 Cherry Creek South Drive, Suite 520

Denver, CO 80209

John Scott Black

Attorney at Daly & Black P.C.

Suite 800, 2211 Norfolk Street

Houston, TX 77098

Richard D. Daly

Attorney at Daly & Black, P.C.

2211 Norfolk Street, Suite 800

Houston, TX 77098

Sean Bradley Leventhal

Attorney at Leventhal Sar LLC

3200 Cherry Creek South Drive, Suite 520

Denver, CO 80209

Defendant Attorneys

Angela Marie Vichick

Attorney at Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP-Denver

1200 17Th Street, One Tabor Center, Suite 3000

Denver, CO 80202

Brian John Spano

Attorney at Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP-Denver

1200 17Th Street, One Tabor Center, Suite 3000

Denver, CO 80202

Holly C. White

Attorney at Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP-Denver

1200 17Th Street, One Tabor Center, Suite 3000

Denver, CO 80202

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (trvo, ) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

1 #3

Exhibit C - Summons

1 #4

Exhibit D - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal

#5

(#5) COMPLAINT for Damages and Jury Demand against Liberty Insurance Corporation, filed by Emily Medina.(trvo, ) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit B - Return of Service

1 #5

Exhibit E - Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Liberty Insurance Corporation from District Court, Arapahoe County, Colorado, Case Number 2019CV32401. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7026051), filed by Liberty Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Return of Service, #3 Exhibit C - Summons, #4 Exhibit D - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #5 Exhibit E - Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vichick, Angela) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance Richard D. Daly by Richard D. Daly on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Richard D. Daly added to party Emily Medina(pty:pla) (Daly, Richard) (Entered: 01/20/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: This matter comes before the Court sua sponte. The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.1 no later than 45 days after the answer, motion to dismiss or other response to the complaint is filed. Each partys lead trial counsel shall attend the conference. The conference shall be held in Courtroom A-902, Alfred A. Arraj U.S. Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. The parties are directed to jointly contact Chambers by telephone at (303) 844-4694 or by email at Jackson_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov to obtain a scheduling conference date. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 12/5/19. (rbjsec. ) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Filing State Court Records by Defendant Liberty Insurance Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Records)(Vichick, Angela) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#6

(#6) RETURN of Service of Complaint and Summons upon Liberty Insurance Corporation on 11/14/2019. (trvo, ) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

2 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Records

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Sean Bradley Leventhal on behalf of Emily MedinaAttorney Sean Bradley Leventhal added to party Emily Medina(pty:pla) (Leventhal, Sean) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jonathan Shawn Sar on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Jonathan Shawn Sar added to party Emily Medina(pty:pla) (Sar, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance John Scott Black by Richard D. Daly on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Daly, Richard) (Entered: 01/20/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Brian John Spano on behalf of Liberty Insurance CorporationAttorney Brian John Spano added to party Liberty Insurance Corporation(pty:dft) (Spano, Brian) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Holly C. White on behalf of Liberty Insurance CorporationAttorney Holly C. White added to party Liberty Insurance Corporation(pty:dft) (White, Holly) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#12

(#12) ANSWER to #5 Complaint by Liberty Insurance Corporation.(Vichick, Angela) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance John Scott Black by Richard D. Daly on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Daly, Richard) (Entered: 01/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance Richard D. Daly by Richard D. Daly on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Richard D. Daly added to party Emily Medina(pty:pla) (Daly, Richard) (Entered: 01/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • Docket(#14) MINUTE ORDER: A Scheduling Conference is set for 3/19/2020 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom A 902 before Judge R. Brooke Jackson. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 1/17/2020. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. ) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Holly C. White on behalf of Liberty Insurance CorporationAttorney Holly C. White added to party Liberty Insurance Corporation(pty:dft) (White, Holly) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to #5 Complaint by Liberty Insurance Corporation.(Vichick, Angela) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jonathan Shawn Sar on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Jonathan Shawn Sar added to party Emily Medina(pty:pla) (Sar, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Sean Bradley Leventhal on behalf of Emily MedinaAttorney Sean Bradley Leventhal added to party Emily Medina(pty:pla) (Leventhal, Sean) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Brian John Spano on behalf of Liberty Insurance CorporationAttorney Brian John Spano added to party Liberty Insurance Corporation(pty:dft) (Spano, Brian) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: This matter comes before the Court sua sponte. The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.1 no later than 45 days after the answer, motion to dismiss or other response to the complaint is filed. Each partys lead trial counsel shall attend the conference. The conference shall be held in Courtroom A-902, Alfred A. Arraj U.S. Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. The parties are directed to jointly contact Chambers by telephone at (303) 844-4694 or by email at Jackson_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov to obtain a scheduling conference date. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 12/5/19. (rbjsec. ) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (trvo, ) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RETURN of Service of Complaint and Summons upon Liberty Insurance Corporation on 11/14/2019. (trvo, ) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) COMPLAINT for Damages and Jury Demand against Liberty Insurance Corporation, filed by Emily Medina.(trvo, ) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (trvo, ) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • Docket(#3) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (trvo, ) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Filing State Court Records by Defendant Liberty Insurance Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Records)(Vichick, Angela) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Liberty Insurance Corporation from District Court, Arapahoe County, Colorado, Case Number 2019CV32401. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7026051), filed by Liberty Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Return of Service, #3 Exhibit C - Summons, #4 Exhibit D - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #5 Exhibit E - Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vichick, Angela) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.