This case was last updated from PACER on 08/16/2019 07:51:59

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 06/17/2019 a Prisoner - Other Prisoner case was filed by Medina-Hernandez against Breckon in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Virginia Western District.

Case Details

  • Case Number 7:19-CV-00454
  • Filing Date 06/17/2019
  • Case Status Disposed - Other Disposed
  • Case Type Prisoner - Other Prisoner
  • Jurisdiction U.S. District Courts
  • Judge Glen E. Conrad
  • Courthouse Virginia Western District

Party Details

  • Petitioner Zuriel Medina-Hernandez
  • Represented By
    • Self Represented
  • Respondent The Federal Burea of Prisons
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Respondent The United States Attorney General
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Respondent M. Breckon
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

#4

(#4) MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conr...

Free with Subscription
#7

(#7) ORDER denying #6 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by ...

Fees Apply
#6

(#6) MOTION for Reconsideration re #5 Order Dismissing Case ...

Fees Apply
#5

(#5) FINAL ORDER DISMISSING CASE (Order and/or Opinion maile...

Fees Apply
#3

(#3) Consent to Fee by Petitioner Zuriel Medina-Hernandez (s...

Fees Apply
#2

(#2) Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant...

Fees Apply
#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 USC 2...

Fees Apply

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2019
  • (#7) ORDER denying #6 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 7/22/2019. (tvt)
  • 07/18/2019
  • (#6) MOTION for Reconsideration re #5 Order Dismissing Case by Zuriel Medina-Hernandez.
  • 07/03/2019
  • (#5) FINAL ORDER DISMISSING CASE (Order and/or Opinion mailed to Pro Se Party). Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 7/3/2019. (slt)
  • 07/03/2019
  • (#4) MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 7/3/2019. (slt)
  • 07/01/2019
  • (#3) Consent to Fee by Petitioner Zuriel Medina-Hernandez (slt)
  • 06/18/2019
  • (#2) Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 28 USC Section 2241; Regarding Statement of Assets;Consent to Fee; Assessing a filing fee; Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal Responses due by 7/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 6/18/2019. (slt)
  • 06/17/2019
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 USC 2241, filed by Zuriel Medina-Hernandez.(slt)

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.