This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/21/2021 at 22:54:08 (UTC).

MEDIEVAL KNIGHTS LLC v. SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION et al

Case Summary

On December 8, 2021, Medieval Knights LLC (“MKLLC” or the “Company”), represented by Caroline Lewis Wolverton of Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP, filed a civil action against the Small Business Administration (“SBA”) and its Administrator, Isabella C. Guzman (collectively, “Defendants”), seeking declaratory and injunctive relief along with costs and attorneys’ fees, for the Defendants’ alleged unlawful withholding of emergency federal financial assistance. This case was filed in U.S. District Court in the District of Columbia with Judge Carl J. Nichols presiding. 

 

In the complaint, the Plaintiff alleged that, “MKLLC produces live performances at venues in nine states: Florida, California, New Jersey, Illinois, Texas, South Carolina, Arizona, Georgia and Maryland. MKLLC demonstrated eligibility for a SVOG award in its application to the SBA and, following an initial denial, an appeal to the SBA. The SBA denied MKLLC’s appeal. Compounding the injury, the SBA granted the SVOG application of a similar theatrical producer a SVOG application of at least six venues that are direct competitors of the venues where MKLLC serves as a theatrical producer.”

 

The Plaintiff further alleged that, “SVOG funds are limited, and once the SBA has depleted the appropriated amount through awards, eligible businesses may not be able to receive the emergency assistance. Thus, even though MKLLC demonstrated that it is an eligible theatrical producer, it may receive no assistance if SVOG funds are depleted before the SBA corrects the erroneous denial of MKLLC’s application.”

 

The Plaintiff lists out three claims for relief. The first claim alleged is for the Arbitrary and Capricious Agency Action. The second claim alleged is for Agency Action contrary to Law, and the third claim alleged is for Agency Decision unsupported by Substantial Evidence. The Plaintiff alleged that a basic requirement of administrative law is that an agency provides the reasons for its decisions, however, the SBA gave no reason for denying MKLLC’s application, and provided only a conclusory decision that does not explain the agency’s reasoning when it denied MKLLC’s appeal. The Plaintiff then alleged that the SBA further erred by treating MKLLC disparately from similarly situated direct competitors that were granted SVOG awards. The Plaintiff further alleged that the SBA’s denial of MKLLC’s SVOG award request is supported by no evidence in the record, let alone substantial evidence, and that MKLLC’s application and appeal presented evidence that demonstrates MKLLC is eligible for a SVOG award.

 

In their prayer for relief, the Plaintiff requested that the Court to set aside the Defendants’ denial of MKLLC’s SVOG award request and declare it unlawful, to preliminarily and permanently order the Defendants to consider MKLLC’s application for a SVOG award consistent with applicable law and the evidence before the SBA, to award MKLLC $10,000,000 in SVOG funds, and to retain appropriations from the Economic Aid to Hard-Hit Small Businesses, Nonprofits, and Venues Act and/or the American Rescue Plan in an amount sufficient to fund the Plaintiff’s SVOG initial grant award. The Plaintiff further requested the Court for their costs, reasonable attorney fees and such other and further relief as the Court deems just and proper.

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-03219

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Carl J. Nichols

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MEDIEVAL KNIGHTS LLC

Defendants

SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION

ISABELLA CASILLAS GUZMAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Caroline Lewis Wolverton

Attorney at AKIN GUMP STRAUSS HAUER & FELD LLP

2001 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/14/2021. (Wolverton, Caroline) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

#8

(#8) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ISABELLA CASILLAS GUZMAN served on 12/13/2021 (Wolverton, Caroline) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

#7

(#7) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION served on 12/13/2021 (Wolverton, Caroline) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

#6

(#6) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/9/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/7/2022. (Wolverton, Caroline) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on December 14, 2021. (lccjn1) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

4 #1

Text of Proposed Order

4 #4

Main Document

3 #1

Notice and Consent

3 #3

Main Document

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by MEDIEVAL KNIGHTS LLC. Case related to Case No. 1:21-cv-03213. (Wolverton, Caroline) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

1 #5

Summons

1 #4

Summons

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

7 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/14/2021. (Wolverton, Caroline) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ISABELLA CASILLAS GUZMAN served on 12/13/2021 (Wolverton, Caroline) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION served on 12/13/2021 (Wolverton, Caroline) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/9/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/7/2022. (Wolverton, Caroline) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketCases 21-3214, 21-3215 and 21-3219 have been consolidated with case 21-3213, pursuant to an Order entered 12/14/2021. From this date forward, all pleadings shall be filed ONLY in the lead case, Civil Action No. 21-3213. (zeg) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on December 14, 2021. (lccjn1) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Consolidate Cases by MEDIEVAL KNIGHTS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wolverton, Caroline) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to ISABELLA CASILLAS GUZMAN, SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zsb) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by MEDIEVAL KNIGHTS LLC. Case related to Case No. 1:21-cv-03213. (Wolverton, Caroline) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against ISABELLA CASILLAS GUZMAN, SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8915484) filed by MEDIEVAL KNIGHTS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Wolverton, Caroline) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Small Business Administration is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Caroline Lewis Wolverton