This case was last updated from PACER on 10/11/2021 at 08:44:59 (UTC).

Medicis v. Ally Bank et al

Case Summary

On 08/12/2021 Medicis filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Ally Bank. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Nelson Stephen Roman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:21-CV-06799

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nelson Stephen Roman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

David De Medicis

Defendants

Ally Bank

Ally Financial Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gary Steven Graifman

Attorney at Kantrowitz Goldhamer & Graifman, P.C.

747 Chestnut Ridge Road

Chestnut Ridge, NY 10977

Melissa R. Emert

Attorney at Kantrowitz, Goldhamer & Graifman, P.C.

747 Chestnut Ridge Road, Suite 200

Chestnut Ridge, NY 10977

Jonathan Shub

Attorney at Shub Law Firm LLC

134 Kings Highway, Second Floor

Haddonfield, NJ 08033

Patrick Kevin Slyne

Attorney at Stull, Stull & Brody

6 East 45Th Street

New York, NY 10017

Defendant Attorneys

Brooke Elizabeth Cucinella

Attorney at Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

425 Lexington Ave

New York, NY 10017

Rachel Sparks Bradley

Attorney at Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP (NY)

425 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Richard Walker

Attorney at Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

425 Lexington Ave

New York, NY 10017

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

#13

#14

#15

#16

#17

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patrick Kevin Slyne on behalf of David De Medicis..(Slyne, Patrick) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Ally Financial Inc. served on 8/30/2021, answer due 9/20/2021. Service was accepted by Kathy Hunter- Manager. Document filed by David De Medicis..(Graifman, Gary) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 12/9/2021. Responses due by 12/9/2021. Replies due by 12/9/2021. (yv) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER terminating #10 Letter Motion for Conference re: #10 LETTER MOTION for Conference on Defendants' anticipated motion to dismiss the Complaint addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Brooke E. Cucinella dated September 17, 2021. The Court has reviewed Defendants' letter motion seeking leave to file its proposed motion to dismiss (ECF No. 10) and Plaintiff's response thereto (ECF No. 14). The Court waives the pre-motion conference requirement and grants Defendants leave to file the propose motion to dismiss as follows: moving papers shall be served (not filed) on October 25, 2021; opposition papers shall be served (not filed) on November 24, 2021; reply papers shall be served December 9, 2021. All motion papers shall be filed on the reply date, December 9, 2021. The parties shall provide the Court with two hard courtesy copies of all motion papers as they are served. The Clerk of Court is kindly directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 10. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 9/24/21) (yv) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Melissa R. Emert dated September 22, 2021 re: #10 LETTER MOTION for Conference on Defendants' anticipated motion to dismiss the Complaint addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Brooke E. Cucinella dated September 17, 2021. . Document filed by David De Medicis..(Emert, Melissa) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Melissa R. Emert on behalf of David De Medicis..(Emert, Melissa) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard Walker on behalf of Ally Bank, Ally Financial Inc...(Walker, Richard) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rachel Sparks Bradley on behalf of Ally Bank, Ally Financial Inc...(Sparks Bradley, Rachel) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) LETTER MOTION for Conference on Defendants' anticipated motion to dismiss the Complaint addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Brooke E. Cucinella dated September 17, 2021. Document filed by Ally Bank, Ally Financial Inc...(Cucinella, Brooke) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Ally Financial Inc. for Ally Bank. Document filed by Ally Bank, Ally Financial Inc...(Cucinella, Brooke) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ally Bank, Ally Financial Inc.. (vf) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (vf) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Gary Steven Graifman. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (vf) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Gary Steven Graifman to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Signature Error; Signature of the ECF Filing Attorney User not provided. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (vf) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Gary Steven Graifman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: David De Medicis. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (vf) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ally Bank and Ally Financial Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by David De Medicis..(Graifman, Gary) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Graifman, Gary) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SIGNATURE ERROR - COMPLAINT against Ally Bank, Ally Financial Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24926508)Document filed by David De Medicis..(Graifman, Gary) Modified on 8/13/2021 (vf). (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ally Bank is a litigant

Latest cases where Ally Financial Inc. is a litigant