This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/27/2021 at 12:54:35 (UTC).

Medicaid and Medicare Advantage Products Association of Puerto Rico, Inc. et al v. Carrau-Martinez et al

Case Summary

On 12/29/2020 Medicaid and Medicare Advantage Products Association of Puerto Rico, Inc filed a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality lawsuit against Carrau-Martinez. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District. The Judge overseeing this case is Daniel R. Dominguez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01760

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Daniel R. Dominguez

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MCS Advantage, Inc.

Medicaid and Medicare Advantage Products Association of Puerto Rico, Inc.

MMM Healthcare, LLC

Triple-S Vida, Inc.

Humana Health Plans of Puerto Rico, Inc.

First Medical Health Plan, Inc.

Triple-S Salud, Inc.

Triple-S Advantage, Inc.

Humana Insurance of Puerto Rico, Inc.

Defendants

Ines del C. Carrau-Martinez

Rafael Cestero Lopategu

Mariano A. Mier-Romeu

Esq. Domingo Emanuelli-Hernandez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jose A. Hernandez-Mayoral

Attorney at Hernandez Mayoral Law Office

206 Tetuan, 7Th Floor Suite 702

San Juan, PR 00901

Mariacte Correa-Cestero

Attorney at O'Neill & Borges

250 Munoz Rivera Ave., Suite 800

San Juan, PR 00918-1813

Ricardo J. Casellas-Santana

Attorney at O'Neill & Borges

250 Munoz Rivera Ave., Suite 800

San Juan, PR 00918-1813

Roberto L. Prats-Palerm

Attorney at RPP Law PSC

1509 Lopez Landron 10Th Floor, American Airlines Bldg. Suite 1000

San Juan, PR 00911

Luis R. Roman-Negron

Attorney at Sanabria Bauermeister Garcia & Berio

P.O.Box. 363068

San Juan, PR 00936-3068

Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera

Attorney at Estrella, LLC

Po Box 9023596

San Juan, PR 00902-3596

Defendant Attorney

Raul Castellanos-Malave

Attorney at Development and Construction Law Group LLC

1507 Ponce De Leon Avenue

San Juan, PR 00909

 

Court Documents

#14

#13

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

5 #1

Summons

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #4

Summons

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Category Sheet

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER granting #14 Motion to Substitute Party. Ines del C. Carrau-Martinez and Rafael Cestero Lopategui terminated. Domingo Emanuelli Hernandez and Mariano A. Mier Romeu added as public officer parties. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 2/10/2021. (EA) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION to Substitute Party filed by Raul Castellanos-Malave on behalf of Domingo Emanuelli-Hernandez, Mariano A. Mier-Romeu Responses due by 2/19/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Castellanos-Malave, Raul) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Extension of Time to Plead by Raul Castellanos-Malave on behalf of Mariano A. Mier-Romeu (Castellanos-Malave, Raul) Modified on 2/5/2021 remove italics (gav). (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of time. The Puerto Rico Department of Justice is to answer the complaint or otherwise plead by 3/8/2021. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 2/4/2021. (EA) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Extension to Time to Plead by Raul Castellanos-Malave on behalf of Domingo Emanuelli-Hernandez (Castellanos-Malave, Raul) Modified on 2/4/2021 remove italics (gav). (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Ines del C. Carrau-Martinez served on 1/13/2021, answer due 2/3/2021. (Hernandez-Mayoral, Jose) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Rafael Cestero Lopategu served on 1/15/2021, answer due 2/5/2021. (Hernandez-Mayoral, Jose) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Ricardo J. Casellas-Santana on behalf of MCS Advantage, Inc. (Casellas-Santana, Ricardo) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Roberto L. Prats-Palerm on behalf of MMM Healthcare, LLC (Prats-Palerm, Roberto) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STANDING ORDER RE CODE OF CIVITLIY. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 8/4/2017.(gav) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Ines del C. Carrau-Martinez, Rafael Cestero Lopategu (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ad) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT : Case has been assigned to Judge Daniel R. Dominguez (ad) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Luis R. Roman-Negron on behalf of Triple-S Advantage, Inc., Triple-S Salud, Inc., Triple-S Vida, Inc. (Roman-Negron, Luis) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Notice by Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera on behalf of First Medical Health Plan, Inc. (Suria-Rivera, Kenneth) Modified on 12/30/2020 remove italics (gav). (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Mariacte Correa-Cestero on behalf of MCS Advantage, Inc. (Correa-Cestero, Mariacte) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Ines del C. Carrau-Martinez, Rafael Cestero Lopategu ( Filing fee $402 receipt number 0104-7133172.), filed by MCS Advantage, Inc., Triple-S Advantage, Inc., First Medical Health Plan, Inc., Humana Health Plans of Puerto Rico, Inc., MMM Healthcare, LLC, Humana Insurance of Puerto Rico, Inc., Medicaid and Medicare Advantage Products Association of Puerto Rico, Inc., Triple-S Salud, Inc., Triple-S Vida, Inc.. Service due by 3/29/2021, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Hernandez-Mayoral, Jose) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Triple S Vida, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Triple-S Advantage, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where TRIPLE-S SALUD, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where MMM Healthcare, LLC is a litigant