This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/01/2019 at 08:11:20 (UTC).

Medicaid and Medicare Advantage Association of Puerto Rico, Inc. v. Longo-Quinones et al

Case Summary

On 10/02/2019 Medicaid and Medicare Advantage Association of Puerto Rico, Inc filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Longo-Quinones. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District. The Judge overseeing this case is Aida M. Delgado-Colon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01940

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Aida M. Delgado-Colon

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Humana Health Plans of Puerto Rico, Inc.

383 Ave. Roosevelt

San Juan, PR 00918

MMM Healthcare, LLC

Po Box 71114

San Juan, PR 00936-8014

MCS Advantage, Inc.

Medicaid and Medicare Advantage Association of Puerto Rico, Inc.

Triple S Advantage, Inc.

Lot 18, Suite 300

Guaynabo, PR 00966

Defendants

Javier Rivera-Rios

Dennise Longo-Quinones

Intervenor Defendants

San Jorge Children's Hospital Inc.

Hospital Menonita Guayama, Inc.

Mennonite General Hospital, Inc.

Hospital Menonita Caguas, Inc.

Asociacion de Hospitales de Puerto Rico, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ignacio Fernandez-De-Lahongrais

Attorney at Fernandez & Alcaraz, PSC

Capital Center Bldg. South Tower Suite 202, 239 Arterial Hostos

San Juan, PR 00918-1475

Michael B. Kimberly

Attorney at McDermott Will & Emery LLP

500 North Capitol Street Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Sarah P. Hogarth

Attorney at McDermott Will & Emery LLP

500 North Capitol Street Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Diego Rodrigo Melendez-Apellaniz

Attorney at O'Neill & Borges, LLC

250 Munoz Rivera Ave., Suite 800

San Juan, PR 00918

Mariacte Correa-Cestero

Attorney at O'Neill & Borges

250 Munoz Rivera Ave., Suite 800

San Juan, PR 00918-1813

Luis R. Roman-Negron

Attorney at Sanabria Bauermeister Garcia & Berio

P.O.Box. 363068

San Juan, PR 00936-3068

Defendant Attorney

Raul Castellanos-Malave

Attorney at Development and Construction Law Group LLC

1507 Ponce De Leon Avenue

San Juan, PR 00909

Intervenor Defendant Attorneys

Carla S. Loubriel

208 Ponce De Leon Ave., Popular Center Bldg. Suite 1400

Hato Rey, PR 00918

Jorge L. Flores-De Jesus

Attorney at Snchez Betances, Sifre & Muoz Noya, CSP

33 Bolivia Street, 5Th Floor

San Juan, PR 00936-4428

Jaime Sifre-Rodriguez

Attorney at Sanchez-Betances, Sifre & Munoz-Noya Law Offices, PSC

Po Box 364428

San Juan, PR 00936-4428

Luis Sanchez-Betances

Attorney at Sanchez-Betances, Sifre & Munoz-Noya Law Offices, PSC

Po Box 364428

San Juan, PR 00936-4428

Cesar T. Alcover-Acosta

Attorney at Casellas, Alcover & Burgos PSC

Po Box 364924

San Juan, PR 00936-4924

Diana Perez-Seda

Attorney at Casellas, Alcover & Burgos PSC

Po Box 364924

San Juan, PR 00936-4924

 

Court Documents

#30

#29

#28

#23

#21

15 #4

Exhibit D

15 #2

Exhibit B

15 #1

Exhibit A

#15

#4

#3

#2

1 #5

Summons

1 #4

Summons

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit Act 90-2019 Official translation

1 #1

Exhibit Act 90-2019

#1

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) ORDER holding in abeyance #15 MOTION to Intervene; granting #21 Motion to allow Ankur Goel to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number PRX100067544) ; granting #22 Motion to allow Sarah Hogarth to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number PRX100067544) ; granting #23 Motion to allow Michael Kimberly to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number PRX100067544); holding in abeyance #26 MOTION for Joinder as to Request for Intervention Re: #15 MOTION to Intervene; granting in part and denying in part #28 MOTION for Extension of Time until December 16, 2019 to File Response/Reply; granting in part and denying in part #29 MOTION for extension of time; granting in part and denying in part #30 MOTION for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 11/13/2019.(wm) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Luis R. Roman-Negron on behalf of Triple S Advantage, Inc. Responses due by 11/21/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Roman-Negron, Luis) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) MOTION for extension of time filed by Diego Rodrigo Melendez-Apellaniz on behalf of MCS Advantage, Inc. Responses due by 11/21/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Melendez-Apellaniz, Diego) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) MOTION for Extension of Time until December 16, 2019 to File Response/Reply filed by Ignacio Fernandez-De-Lahongrais on behalf of MMM Healthcare, LLC, Medicaid and Medicare Advantage Association of Puerto Rico, Inc. Responses due by 11/21/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Fernandez-De-Lahongrais, Ignacio) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) ORDER re #24 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Granted as requested. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 11/6/2019. (wm) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) MOTION for Joinder as to Request for Intervention Re: #15 MOTION to Intervene filed by Asociacion de Hospitales de Puerto Rico, Inc., Hospital Menonita Guayama, Inc., Mennonite General Hospital, Inc., Hospital Menonita Caguas, Inc. filed by Carla S. Loubriel on behalf of San Jorge Children's Hospital Inc. Responses due by 11/20/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #15 ) (Loubriel, Carla) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) NOTICE of Appearance by Jaime Sifre-Rodriguez on behalf of Hospital Menonita Caguas, Inc., Hospital Menonita Guayama, Inc. (Sifre-Rodriguez, Jaime) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) NOTICE of Appearance and Request of Additional Time to Plead by Raul Castellanos-Malave on behalf of Dennise Longo-Quinones, Javier Rivera-Rios (Castellanos-Malave, Raul) Modified on 10/30/2019 to edit event (rom). (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) Motion to allow Michael Kimberly to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number PRX100067544) filed by Ignacio Fernandez-De-Lahongrais on behalf of MMM Healthcare, LLC Responses due by 11/12/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Fernandez-De-Lahongrais, Ignacio) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) Motion to allow Sarah Hogarth to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number PRX100067544) filed by Ignacio Fernandez-De-Lahongrais on behalf of MMM Healthcare, LLC Responses due by 11/12/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Fernandez-De-Lahongrais, Ignacio) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER. The Clerk of Court shall randomly reassign this case to another judge. Signed by Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez on 10/8/2019.(om) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • (#9) MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: Pursuant to the Order of Recusal entered by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez (Docket No. 8), this case has been randomly reassigned to the docket of Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez. Signed by Clerk on 10/07/2019. (gr) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • (#8) ORDER OF RECUSAL. The undersigned hereby disqualifies himself from presiding over this matter. The case shall randomly be reassigned immediately to another Article III judge. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 10/7/2019. (EA) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Issued as to Dennise Longo-Quinones, Javier Rivera-Rios (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • (#6) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Daniel R. Dominguez (arg) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Compliance by Medicaid and Medicare Advantage Association of Puerto Rico, Inc. re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Category Sheet) (Fernandez-De-Lahongrais, Ignacio) (Entered: 10/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Leave to Appear filed by Diego Rodrigo Melendez-Apellaniz on behalf of MCS Advantage, Inc. Responses due by 10/17/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Melendez-Apellaniz, Diego) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Mariacte Correa-Cestero on behalf of MCS Advantage, Inc. (Correa-Cestero, Mariacte) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING. Category Sheet not included electronically pursuant to L.Civ.R. 3(a). Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 10/4/2019. (arg) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6621268.), filed by Medicaid and Medicare Advantage Association of Puerto Rico, Inc., MCS Advantage, Inc., Triple S Advantage, Inc., MMM Healthcare, LLC, Humana Health Plans of Puerto Rico, Inc.. Service due by 12/31/2019, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Act 90-2019, #2 Exhibit Act 90-2019 Official translation, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Fernandez-De-Lahongrais, Ignacio) Modified on 11/6/2019 to edit docket text (rom). (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MENNONITE GENERAL HOSPITAL, INC., d/b/a Hospital Menontia CIMA, d/b/a Sistema de Salud Menonita, d/b/a Hospital Menonita Aibonito is a litigant

Latest cases where Hospital Menonita Caguas, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Triple-S Advantage, Inc. is a litigant