This case was last updated from PACER on 08/16/2021 at 11:56:35 (UTC).

Mediatek Inc. et al v. NXP Semiconductors N.V. et al

Case Summary

On June 17, 2021, MediaTek Inc. and MediaTek USA Inc. (“MediaTek” or “Plaintiffs”) represented by Kevin P. B. Johnson of Quinn Emanuel Urquhart and Sullivan LLP filed an intellectual property lawsuit against NXP Semiconductors N.V. and NXP USA, Inc. (collectively, “NXP”), Avnet, Inc. (“Avnet”), Arrow Electronics, Inc. (“Arrow”), Denso Ten Limited and others (collectively, “Defendants”), seeking damages along with prejudgment and post judgement interest among other reliefs for the alleged infringement of the United States patents of the Plaintiff. The case was filed in the United States District Court in the Central District of California.

 

The Plaintiff filed this complaint for the alleged infringement of the U.S. Patent No. 6,738,845 (the “’845 patent”), U.S. Patent No. 6,823,451 (the “’451 patent”), U.S. Patent No. 8,464,037 (the “’037 patent”), U.S. Patent No. 9,265,056, (the “’056 patent”), U.S. Patent No. 9,538,531 (the “’531 patent”), and U.S. Patent No. 10,211,948 (the “’948 patent”) (collectively, “the Asserted Patents” or “Patents-in-suit”) owned by them. 

 

In the complaint, the Plaintiff alleged that, “In violation of 35 U.S.C. § 271(a), Defendants identified in the Complaint have infringed the ’037 patent by making, using, selling, offering for sale, and/or importing into the United States, without authority, the Accused ’037 NXP Products which practice each and every limitation of at least claim 19 of the ’037 patent. Defendants have infringed literally and/or under the doctrine of equivalents.”

 

Further, the Plaintiff alleged that, “NXP has had knowledge of the ’037 patent and its infringement of the ’037 Patent at least since the service of this complaint” and “NXP has contributed to the infringement by its customers of the ’037 Patent by, without authority, importing, selling and offering to sell within the United States materials and apparatuses for practicing the claimed invention of the ’037 patent both inside and outside the United States.”

 

The Plaintiff also alleged that, “Defendants’ infringement of the ’037 patent has been and continues to be willful. Defendants have had knowledge of the ’037 patent and its infringement of the ’037 patent at least since the service of this complaint. Defendants have deliberately continued to infringe in a wanton, malicious, and egregious manner, with reckless disregard for MediaTek’s patent rights.”

 

Similar allegations have been made by the Plaintiff with reference to the infringement of other Patents-in-suit. 

 

Other than these allegations, the Plaintiff also alleged that the Defendants other than NXP “uses, imports, offers for sale, and/or sells at least one of the Accused ’451 NXP products and the Accused ’037 NXP products at least by selling and offering to sell the Accused ’451 NXP Products and the Accused ’037 NXP products as part of their own products in the United States.”

 

There are six claims for relief laid down by the Plaintiff, one for the alleged infringement of each of the Patents-in-suit.  

 

In the prayer for relief, the Plaintiff has requested the Court to declare that Defendants have infringed the asserted patents, and award damages for the alleged infringement of the Asserted Patents pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 284 along with prejudgment and post judgement interests. The Plaintiff also requested the Court to grant an award to Plaintiff for its attorneys’ fees and costs pursuant to 35 U.S.C.§ 285 and any other relief the Court deems just and equitable. 

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.




Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-04969

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George H. Wu

Referral Judge

Alexander F. MacKinnon

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MediaTek USA Inc.

Mediatek Inc.

Defendants

NXP USA, Inc.

Denso Ten America Limited

NXP Semiconductors N.V.

Arrow Electronics, Inc.

Robert Bosch LLC

Denso Ten Limited

Avnet, Inc.

Robert Bosch GmbH

Continental AG

Continental Automotive GmbH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kevin P. B. Johnson

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart and Sullivan LLP

555 Twin Dolphin Drive 5Th Floor

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

Lance L Yang

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart Sullivan LLP

865 South Figueroa Street 10Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Sean S Pak

Attorney at Quinn Emmanuel Urquhart and Sullivan LLP

50 California Street 22Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-4788

Defendant Attorneys

David H Ben-Meir

Attorney at Norton Rose Fulbright LLP

555 South Flower Street 41St Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Brian A Sun

Attorney at Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP

555 South Flower Street Suite 41St Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Eric C. Green

Attorney at Norton Rose Fubright US LLP

98 San Jacinto Boulevard Suite 1100

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

#31

(#31) NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Eric C. Green to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants NXP Semiconductors N.V., NXP USA, Inc., Robert Bosch LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31799835) #30 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(a) Application not complete: state courts to which the applicant has been admitted are not listed. Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Other error(s) with document(s): The attorney seeking to appear pro hac vice must complete Section 1 of this Application, personally sign, in ink, the certification in Section II, and have the designated Local Counsel sign in Section III. ELECTRONIC SIGNATURES ARE NOT ACCEPTED. See Instructions for Applicants (1) (G-64). (lt) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

30 #1

Proposed Order

30 #30

Main Document

#28

(#28) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance, #26 , Notice of Appearance, #27 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance of Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

#27

(#27) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Brian A Sun on behalf of Defendants Arrow Electronics, Inc., Robert Bosch LLC (Attorney Brian A Sun added to party Arrow Electronics, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Brian A Sun added to party Robert Bosch LLC(pty:dft))(Sun, Brian) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

#26

(#26) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney David H Ben-Meir on behalf of Defendants Arrow Electronics, Inc., Robert Bosch LLC (Attorney David H Ben-Meir added to party Arrow Electronics, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David H Ben-Meir added to party Robert Bosch LLC(pty:dft))(Ben-Meir, David) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

#29

(#29) ORDER REGARDING JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days) #25 . Defendants' Arrow Electronics, Inc., Avnet, Inc., NXP Semiconductors N.V., NXP USA, Inc., Robert Bosch LLC deadline to file their responsive pleading to the complaint shall be October 11, 2021. (mrgo) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

25 #1

Proposed Order Granting

25 #25

Main Document

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs MediaTek USA Inc., Mediatek Inc., (Johnson, Kevin) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs MediaTek USA Inc., Mediatek Inc.. (Johnson, Kevin) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #1

Main Document

36 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Eric C. Green to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants NXP Semiconductors N.V., NXP USA, Inc., Robert Bosch LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31799835) #30 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(a) Application not complete: state courts to which the applicant has been admitted are not listed. Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Other error(s) with document(s): The attorney seeking to appear pro hac vice must complete Section 1 of this Application, personally sign, in ink, the certification in Section II, and have the designated Local Counsel sign in Section III. ELECTRONIC SIGNATURES ARE NOT ACCEPTED. See Instructions for Applicants (1) (G-64). (lt) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Eric C. Green to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants NXP Semiconductors N.V., NXP USA, Inc., Robert Bosch LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31799835) filed by Defendants NXP Semiconductors N.V., NXP USA, Inc., Robert Bosch LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ben-Meir, David) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance, #26 , Notice of Appearance, #27 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance of Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Brian A Sun on behalf of Defendants Arrow Electronics, Inc., Robert Bosch LLC (Attorney Brian A Sun added to party Arrow Electronics, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Brian A Sun added to party Robert Bosch LLC(pty:dft))(Sun, Brian) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney David H Ben-Meir on behalf of Defendants Arrow Electronics, Inc., Robert Bosch LLC (Attorney David H Ben-Meir added to party Arrow Electronics, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David H Ben-Meir added to party Robert Bosch LLC(pty:dft))(Ben-Meir, David) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) ORDER REGARDING JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days) #25 . Defendants' Arrow Electronics, Inc., Avnet, Inc., NXP Semiconductors N.V., NXP USA, Inc., Robert Bosch LLC deadline to file their responsive pleading to the complaint shall be October 11, 2021. (mrgo) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 10/11/2021 filed by Plaintiffs MediaTek USA Inc., Mediatek Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting)(Pak, Sean) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Brian A Sun counsel for Defendants NXP Semiconductors N.V., NXP USA, Inc.. Adding Brian A. Sun as counsel of record for NXP Semiconductors N.V. and NXP USA, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant NXP Semiconductors N.V. and NXP USA, Inc.. (Attorney Brian A Sun added to party NXP Semiconductors N.V.(pty:dft), Attorney Brian A Sun added to party NXP USA, Inc.(pty:dft))(Sun, Brian) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney David H Ben-Meir counsel for Defendants NXP Semiconductors N.V., NXP USA, Inc.. Adding David H. Ben-Meir as counsel of record for NXP Semiconductors N.V. and NXP USA, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant NXP Semiconductor N.V. and NXP USA, Inc.. (Attorney David H Ben-Meir added to party NXP Semiconductors N.V.(pty:dft), Attorney David H Ben-Meir added to party NXP USA, Inc.(pty:dft))(Ben-Meir, David) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 10/11/2021 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs MediaTek USA Inc., Mediatek Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pak, Sean) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. (See document for details) (mrgo) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE AND ORDER REGARDING TRANSFER AND/OR REASSIGNMENT OF PATENT CASE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. Case transferred from Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr to Judge George H. Wu for all further proceedings. Case number now reads 2:21-cv-04969 GW(AFMx). (rn) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Arrow Electronics, Inc., Avnet, Inc., Continental AG, Continental Automotive GmbH, Denso Ten America Limited, Denso Ten Limited, MediaTek USA Inc., NXP Semiconductors N.V., NXP USA, Inc., Robert Bosch GmbH, Robert Bosch LLC. (lh) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (lh) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs MediaTek USA Inc., Mediatek Inc.. (Johnson, Kevin) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by MediaTek USA Inc., Mediatek Inc.. (Johnson, Kevin) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs MediaTek USA Inc., Mediatek Inc., (Johnson, Kevin) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs MediaTek USA Inc., Mediatek Inc.. (Johnson, Kevin) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31489427 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff MediaTek USA Inc., Mediatek Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (Attorney Kevin P. B. Johnson added to party MediaTek USA Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Kevin P. B. Johnson added to party Mediatek Inc.(pty:pla))(Johnson, Kevin) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Continental Automotive GmbH is a litigant

Latest cases where Continental AG is a litigant

Latest cases where Denso Ten Limited is a litigant