This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/10/2021 at 09:59:36 (UTC).

Media Trademark and Licensing Limited v. COINGEEKLTD.COM

Case Summary

On 02/09/2021 Media Trademark and Licensing Limited filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against COINGEEKLTD COM. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is Dominic W Lanza. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00214

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dominic W Lanza

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Media Trademark and Licensing Limited

Defendant

COINGEEKLTD.COM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Samuel A Lewis

Attorney at Cozen OConnor PC - Miami, FL

200 S Biscayne Blvd., 30Th Fl.

Miami, FL 33131

Julie Lynn Trester

Attorney at Meckler Bulger Tilson Marick & Pearson LLP

123 N Wacker Dr., Ste, 1800

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) *NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Media Trademark and Licensing Limited. (Lewis, Samuel) *Modified to correct event and text on 2/16/2021 (REK). (Entered: 02/12/2021)

#7

(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Media Trademark and Licensing Limited. (Lewis, Samuel) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

#6

(#6) PRELIMINARY ORDER: IT IS ORDERED: 1. That Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order on Defendant (s) and file a notice of service with the Clerk of Court; 2. That, unless the Court orders otherwise, on May 11, 2021, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 2/9/21. (MAW) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Media Trademark and Licensing Limited. (JAM) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

3 #1

AO 121

#3

(#3) MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (Attachments: #1 AO 121)(JAM) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

#2

(#2) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19143108. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Dominic W Lanza. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-214-PHX-DWL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (JAM) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19143108 filed by Media Trademark and Licensing Limited.(Trester, Julie) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(JAM) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) *NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Media Trademark and Licensing Limited. (Lewis, Samuel) *Modified to correct event and text on 2/16/2021 (REK). (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Media Trademark and Licensing Limited. (Lewis, Samuel) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketRemark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Samuel A Lewis on behalf of Plaintiff Media Trademark and Licensing Limited. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PRELIMINARY ORDER: IT IS ORDERED: 1. That Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order on Defendant (s) and file a notice of service with the Clerk of Court; 2. That, unless the Court orders otherwise, on May 11, 2021, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 2/9/21. (MAW) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Media Trademark and Licensing Limited. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(1). No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (JAM) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Media Trademark and Licensing Limited. (JAM) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (Attachments: #1 AO 121)(JAM) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19143108. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Dominic W Lanza. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-214-PHX-DWL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (JAM) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19143108 filed by Media Trademark and Licensing Limited.(Trester, Julie) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(JAM) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer JULIE L. TRESTER

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Samuel Abraham Lewis