This case was last updated from PACER on 07/15/2019 at 11:00:09 (UTC).

Medeiros v. Gladewater

Case Summary

On 03/26/2019 Medeiros filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against Gladewater. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert W. Schroeder, III and John D. Love. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-00109

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert W. Schroeder, III

Referral Judge

John D. Love

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kimberly Medeiros

Defendant

City Of Gladewater

Not Classified By Court

Andy Tindel

Tyler, TX 75702

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nicholas Alban O'Kelly

Attorney at Kilgore & Kilgore, PLLC

3109 Carlisle Street

Dallas, TX 75204

Defendant Attorney

Lance Vincent

Attorney at Ritcheson Lauffer & Vincent

2 American Center, 821 Ese Loop 323, Suite 530

Tyler, TX 75701

 

Court Documents

#25

(#25) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/11/2019. (ksd) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

#24

(#24) PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/11/2019. (ksd) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

#21

(#21) DISCOVERY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/11/2019. (ksd) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

#20

(#20) DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Expert Discovery due by 1/24/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 8/5/2019. Pretrial Order due by 4/8/2020. Jury Selection set for 5/18/2020 at 09:00AM before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Jury Trial set for 5/18/2020 at 09:00 AM before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Pretrial Conference set for 4/23/2020 at 09:00 AM in Tyler Courthouse before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 6/11/2019. (gsg) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

#17

No Description Available

#16

No Description Available

#14

No Description Available

11 #2

Corrected Proposed Order

11 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion

#11

No Description Available

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kimberly Medeiros. City Of Gladewater served on 4/3/2019, answer due 4/24/2019. (O'Kelly, Nicholas) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

#7

(#7) CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge John D Love. (rlf) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

6 #1

*Restricted*

#6

(#6) Case transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:19-cv-00705. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 03/26/2019)

#4

(#5) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THEEASTERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS, TYLER DIVISION: #4 Motion to Transfer Case out of District/Division is granted. ORDERED that this case be transferred from the Northern District of Texas to the Eastern District of Texas, Tyler Division. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 3/26/2019) (svc) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/26/2019.] (Entered: 03/26/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to City of Gladewater. (svc) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/26/2019.] (Entered: 03/21/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against City of Gladewater filed by Kimberly Medeiros. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9864583) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (O'Kelly, Nicholas) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/26/2019.] (Entered: 03/21/2019)

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2019
  • Magistrate Judge John D. Love added as presiding judge. (gsg) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III no longer assigned to case. (gsg) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) ORDER assigning case to Judge Love by consent of the parties for all further proceedings and entry of judgment. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 6/13/2019. (gsg) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/11/2019. (ksd) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • CASE REFERRED to Mediator. Andy Tindel appointed as Mediator. (ksd ) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/11/2019. (ksd) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) E-DISCOVERY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/11/2019. (ksd) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) DISCOVERY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/11/2019. (ksd) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Expert Discovery due by 1/24/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 8/5/2019. Pretrial Order due by 4/8/2020. Jury Selection set for 5/18/2020 at 09:00AM before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Jury Trial set for 5/18/2020 at 09:00 AM before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Pretrial Conference set for 4/23/2020 at 09:00 AM in Tyler Courthouse before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 6/11/2019. (gsg) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Scheduling Conference held on 6/10/2019. (srb) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kimberly Medeiros. City Of Gladewater served on 4/3/2019, answer due 4/24/2019. (O'Kelly, Nicholas) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rlf) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Kimberly Medeiros. (rlf) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge John D Love. (rlf) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Case transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:19-cv-00705. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THEEASTERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS, TYLER DIVISION: #4 Motion to Transfer Case out of District/Division is granted. ORDERED that this case be transferred from the Northern District of Texas to the Eastern District of Texas, Tyler Division. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 3/26/2019) (svc) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/26/2019.] (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division and into the Eastern Distict of Texas, Tyler Division filed by Kimberly Medeiros (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (O'Kelly, Nicholas) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/26/2019.] (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to City of Gladewater. (svc) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/26/2019.] (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (svc) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/26/2019.] (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against City of Gladewater filed by Kimberly Medeiros. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9864583) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (O'Kelly, Nicholas) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/26/2019.] (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less