This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/06/2020 at 11:14:26 (UTC).

Medeck v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/08/2020 Medeck filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Equifax Information Services, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oregon District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ann L. Aiken. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01105

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ann L. Aiken

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robert Joe Medeck

Defendants

Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

Does 1 through 100 Inclusive

KeyBank National Association

Equifax Information Services, LLC

TransUnion, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kyle W. Schumacher

Attorney at Perry, Shields, Campbell, Floyd, PLLC

227 North Loop 1604 East, Suite 130

San Antonio, TX 78232

Defendant Attorneys

Katherine A. Neben

Attorney at Jones Day

3161 Michelson Drive, Suite 800

Irvine, CA 92612

Reilley D. Keating

Attorney at Stoel Rives LLP

760 S.W. Ninth Ave., Suite 3000

Portland, OR 97205

Joel A. Parker

Attorney at Schwabe, Williamson & Wyatt

1211 Sw 5Th Ave, Ste. 1900

Portland, OR 97204

Jeffrey M. Edelson

Attorney at Markowitz Herbold PC

1455 Sw Broadway, Suite 1900

Portland, OR 97201

Nicholas J. Henderson

Attorney at Motschenbacher & Blattner, LLP

117 Sw Taylor St., Suite 300

Portland, OR 97204

James L. Policchio

Attorney at Schuckit & Associates, P.C.

4545 Northwestern Drive

Zionsville, IN 46077

 

Court Documents

#25

#23

#22

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #5

Proposed Summons

1 #4

Proposed Summons

1 #3

Proposed Summons

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Notice of Settlement Filed by Robert Joe Medeck. (Schumacher, Kyle) (Entered: 08/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER: Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #22 . Answer is due by 9/8/2020. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Edelson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint, #1 . Filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Edelson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Keating, Reilley) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Answer to #1 Complaint, Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Keating, Reilley) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Katherine A. Neben for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. #18 . Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (jkm) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Katherine A. Neben. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7079257 #18 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (jkm) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Katherine A. Neben. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7079257. Filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Keating, Reilley) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Answer to #1 Complaint, And Affirmative Defenses Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by TransUnion, LLC. (Policchio, James) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Return of Service Executed as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 7/17/2020, answer due on 8/7/2020. (Schumacher, Kyle) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Return of Service Executed as to Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 7/17/2020, answer due on 8/7/2020. (Schumacher, Kyle) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Return of Service Executed as to KeyBank National Association served on 7/17/2020, answer due on 8/7/2020. (Schumacher, Kyle) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued Electronically as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jkm) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued Electronically as to Equifax Information Services, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jkm) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued Electronically as to KeyBank National Association. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jkm) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued Electronically as to TransUnion, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jkm) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Ann L. Aiken and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 11/6/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 12/7/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 12/7/2020. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (jkm) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed on 7/9/2020 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6957190 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Robert Joe Medeck against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons). (Schumacher, Kyle) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Experian Information Solutions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where TransUnion Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases where KeyBank National Association is a litigant

Latest cases where Equifax Information Services LLC is a litigant