This case was last updated from PACER on 11/24/2020 at 09:08:28 (UTC).

MedARC LLC v. Sedgwick Claims Management Services LTD

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 MedARC LLC filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Sedgwick Claims Management Services LTD. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sam A. Lindsay and David C Godbey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-02969

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Sam A. Lindsay

David C Godbey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MedARC LLC

Defendant

Sedgwick Claims Management Services

Not Classified By Court

Harlin D Hale

Dallas, TX 75242

Case Admin Sup

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Craig A Albert

Attorney at Cherry Petersen Landry Albert LLP

8350 N Central Expressway, Suite 1500

Dallas, TX 75206

Jonathan A Aldaco

Attorney at Cherry Petersen Landry Albert LLP

8350 N Central Expressway, Suite 1500

Dallas, TX 75206

Defendant Attorney

Jeremy William Hays

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart PC

8117 Preston Road, Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75225

 

Court Documents

6 #1

Proposed Order

#6

(#6) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint filed by Sedgwick Claims Management Services (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Jeremy William Hays added to party Sedgwick Claims Management Services(pty:dft) (Hays, Jeremy) Modified on 10/22/2020 (hml). (Entered: 10/21/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER OF REFERENCE: Under authority of 28 U.S.C. sec. 157(a), this case is referred to United States Bankruptcy Judge Harlin D. Hale, who has a related case, for pretrial management. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 10/14/2020) (jmg) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge David C Godbey for all further proceedings. Judge Sam A. Lindsay no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 10/6/2020) (svc) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Sedgwick Claims Management Services. (jmg) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

#2

(#2) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (jmg) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Sedgwick Claims Management Services filed by MedARC LLC. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-11209374) Clerk to issue summonses for federal and non-federal defendants. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Albert, Craig) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint filed by Sedgwick Claims Management Services (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Jeremy William Hays added to party Sedgwick Claims Management Services(pty:dft) (Hays, Jeremy) Modified on 10/22/2020 (hml). (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER OF REFERENCE: Under authority of 28 U.S.C. sec. 157(a), this case is referred to United States Bankruptcy Judge Harlin D. Hale, who has a related case, for pretrial management. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 10/14/2020) (jmg) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge David C Godbey for all further proceedings. Judge Sam A. Lindsay no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 10/6/2020) (svc) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Sedgwick Claims Management Services. (jmg) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (jmg) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Sedgwick Claims Management Services filed by MedARC LLC. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-11209374) Clerk to issue summonses for federal and non-federal defendants. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Albert, Craig) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less