This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/23/2020 at 10:28:50 (UTC).

MedARC LLC v. Cannon Cochran Management Services Inc et al

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 MedARC LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Cannon Cochran Management Services Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is David C Godbey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-02953

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David C Godbey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MedARC LLC

Defendants

Cannon Cochran Management Services Inc

Does 1 - 10

Not Classified By Court

Case Admin Sup

Harlin D Hale

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Donald A Waltz

Kenneth W Biermacher

Andrew D Robertson

Lawrence T Bowman

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit(s) A

1 #2

Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

#14

#13

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE filed by Texas Department of Insurance. (mjr) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE filed by Texas Department of Insurance. (hml) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Summons Reissued as to Does 1 - 10. (jmg) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by MedARC LLC. (Biermacher, Kenneth) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Summons Reissued as to Cannon Cochran Management Services Inc. (mjr) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by MedARC LLC. (Biermacher, Kenneth) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Cannon Cochran Management Services Inc ; served on 10/14/2020. (Biermacher, Kenneth) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER OF REFERENCE: Under authority of 28 U.S.C. sec. 157(a), this case is referred to United States Bankruptcy Judge Harlin D. Hale, who has a related case, for pretrial management. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 10/13/2020) (mjr) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by MedARC LLC. (Biermacher, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge David C Godbey for all further proceedings. Judge Ada Brown no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 9/24/2020) (axm) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Cannon Cochran Management Services Inc, Doe 1 through Doe 10. (jmg) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (jmg) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Related Case filed by MedARC LLC (Biermacher, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Cannon Cochran Management Services Inc and Doe 1 through Doe 10 filed by MedARC, LLC. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-11204392) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Cover Sheet) (Biermacher, Kenneth) Modified text on 9/24/2020 (jmg). (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less