This case was last updated from PACER on 07/29/2021 at 17:24:02 (UTC).

Medallia Inc. v. Content Square SAS

Case Summary

On 05/26/2021 Medallia Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Content Square SAS. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00532

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Medallia Inc.

Defendant

Content Square SAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Melissa Richards Smith

Attorney at Gillam and Smith, LLP

303 South Washington Avenue

Marshall, TX 75670

Amir Ali Tabarrok

Attorney at Rimon, P.C.

2445 Faber Place, Suite 250

Palo Alto, CA 94303

David T. Xue

Attorney at Rimon, P.C.

2445 Faber Place, Suite 250

Palo Alto, CA 94303

Karineh Khachatourian

Attorney at Rimon, P.C.

2445 Faber Place, Suite 250

Palo Alto, CA 94303

Nikolaus Andrew Woloszczuk

Attorney at Rimon, P.C.

2445 Faber Place, Suite 250

Palo Alto, CA 94303

Oren Joseph Torten

Attorney at Rimon, P.C.

2445 Faber Place, Suite 250

Palo Alto, CA 94303

Defendant Attorney

Deron R Dacus

Attorney at The Dacus Firm, P.C.

821 Ese Loop 323, Suite 430

Tyler, TX 75701

 

Court Documents

18 #1

Proposed Order

#18

(#18) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Melissa Richards Smith on Behalf of A. Tabarrok ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14968783) by on behalf of Medallia Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

17 #1

Proposed Order

#17

(#17) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Melissa Richards Smith for D. Xue ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14961389) by on behalf of Medallia Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

16 #1

Proposed Order

#16

(#16) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Content Square SAS. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deron R Dacus on behalf of Content Square SAS. Attorney Deron R Dacus added to party Content Square SAS(pty:dft) (Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

#14

(#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Medallia Inc.. Content Square SAS served on 6/17/2021, answer due 7/8/2021. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

#13

(#13) Standing Order regarding Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Entered: 06/17/2021)

#7

(#7) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Medallia Inc.. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Content Square SAS. (lad) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

#5

(#5) Pro Hac Vice Letter. (lad) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Medallia Inc.. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

#3

(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

#2

(#2) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Medallia Inc.. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#16) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Content Square SAS. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Amir Ali Tabarrok for Medallia Inc. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David T. Xue for Medallia Inc. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Melissa Richards Smith on Behalf of A. Tabarrok ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14968783) by on behalf of Medallia Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Melissa Richards Smith for D. Xue ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14961389) by on behalf of Medallia Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Content Square SAS. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deron R Dacus on behalf of Content Square SAS. Attorney Deron R Dacus added to party Content Square SAS(pty:dft) (Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Medallia Inc.. Content Square SAS served on 6/17/2021, answer due 7/8/2021. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Standing Order regarding Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court are the above Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motions, finds they should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the above Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice are GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicants, if they have not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hs) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court are the above Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motions, finds they should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the above Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice are GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicants, if they have not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hs) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to Content Square SAS. (lad) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Medallia Inc.. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Content Square SAS. (lad) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Pro Hac Vice Letter. (lad) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Medallia Inc.. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Medallia Inc.. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14848266). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Medallia Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, Melissa) (Attachment 2 replaced on 5/27/2021) (lad). (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Oren Joseph Torten

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David T. Xue