This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/01/2022 at 09:10:08 (UTC).

Mecea v. Buzzfeed, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/02/2022 Mecea filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Buzzfeed, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Paul A. Crotty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01741

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul A. Crotty

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robert Mecea

Defendant

Buzzfeed, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James H. Freeman

Attorney at Sanders Law Group

100 Garden City Plaza, Ste 500

Garden City, NY 11530

Craig B. Sanders

Attorney at Sanders Law Group

100 Garden City Plaza, Ste 5Th Floor

Garden City, NY 11530

Defendant Attorney

Nancy Ann Del Pizzo

Attorney at Rivkin Radler, LLP

25 Main Street, Court Plaza North

Hackensack, NJ 07601

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 4/11/22 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(Moya, Goretti) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

#13

RESTRICTED

12 #5

Exhibit 5

12 #4

Exhibit 4

12 #3

Exhibit 3

12 #2

Exhibit 2

12 #1

Exhibit 1

12 #12

Main Document

#11

(#11) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James H. Freeman on behalf of Robert Mecea..(Freeman, James) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Buzzfeed, Inc. served on 3/7/2022, answer due 3/28/2022. Service was accepted by Lynanne Gares, Managing Agent. Document filed by Robert Mecea..(Sanders, Craig) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

#6

(#6) AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (vf) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

#5

(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Buzzfeed, Inc.. (vf) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

#4

(#4) AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Sanders, Craig) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Buzzfeed, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Robert Mecea..(Sanders, Craig) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sanders, Craig) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

1 #2

Exhibit Infringing Use of the Photograph

1 #1

Exhibit Original Photograph

1 #1

Main Document

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 4/11/22 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(Moya, Goretti) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 4/11/2022 before Judge Paul A. Crotty. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/17/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/27/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/25/2022..(Moya, Goretti) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Buzzfeed, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Robert Mecea. Related document: #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5).(Freeman, James) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul A. Crotty: Pre-Motion Conference held on 4/11/2022. REMARK: James Freeman appeared for the Plaintiff. Nancy Del Pizzo appeared for the Defendant. Plaintiff may amend his pleading by April 25, 2022. The following motion schedule is in place: Motion due by May 16, 2022. Response due by June 3, 2022. Reply due by June 17, 2022. See transcript for details. (Court Reporter Rose Prater) (dgo) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James H. Freeman on behalf of Robert Mecea..(Freeman, James) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketCALENDAR ENTRY **REMINDER**: Pre-motion Conference scheduled to go forward on: Monday, April 11, 2022 @ 12:00 PM, via teleconference. The conference will now proceed remotely and the parties are directed to dial-in: 888-363-4749. Access: 8539662 ----- A PDF IS NOT ATTACHED TO THIS ENTRY ----- (By David Gonzalez - Courtroom Deputy).(dgo) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Pre-Motion Conference: A Pre-Motion Conference is scheduled to go forward on: Monday, April 11, 2022 @ 12 noon, 500 Pearl Street, Courtroom 14-C before Judge Paul A. Crotty. If the date is not convenient, either party can e-mail three (3) mutually convenient dates to the Courtroom Deputy at: David_C_Gonzalez@nysd.uscourts.gov ----- A PDF IS NOT ATTACHED TO THIS ENTRY ----- (By: David Gonzalez - Courtroom Deputy).(dgo) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) LETTER MOTION for Conference Re: proposed motion to dismiss complaint addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Nancy A. Del Pizzo dated March 28, 2022. Document filed by Buzzfeed, Inc...(Del Pizzo, Nancy) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Comcast Corporation, Other Affiliate NBCUniversal Media LLC for Buzzfeed, Inc.. Document filed by Buzzfeed, Inc...(Del Pizzo, Nancy) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nancy Ann Del Pizzo on behalf of Buzzfeed, Inc...(Del Pizzo, Nancy) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Buzzfeed, Inc. served on 3/7/2022, answer due 3/28/2022. Service was accepted by Lynanne Gares, Managing Agent. Document filed by Robert Mecea..(Sanders, Craig) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (vf) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Buzzfeed, Inc.. (vf) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (vf) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketMagistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Crotty. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Sanders, Craig) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Buzzfeed, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Robert Mecea..(Sanders, Craig) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sanders, Craig) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Buzzfeed, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25804780)Document filed by Robert Mecea. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Original Photograph, #2 Exhibit Infringing Use of the Photograph).(Sanders, Craig) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BUZZFEED INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nancy Ann Del Pizzo