This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/02/2021 at 09:50:50 (UTC).

Means v. Woodget et al (INMATE 1)

Case Summary

On 06/03/2021 Means filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Woodget INMATE 1. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Emily C. Marks and Stephen Michael Doyle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00399

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Emily C. Marks

Referral Judge

Stephen Michael Doyle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kendell Cottrell Means

Union Springs, AL 36089-5107

Defendants

Jeffery Baldwin

Patrice Richie Jones

Bullock Prison Health Services

Sedrick Woodget

Aundra Jackson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Philip Piggott

Attorney at Webster Henry Bradwell Cohan Speagle & DeShazo PC

2 Perimeter Park South; Suite 445 East

Birmingham, AL 35243

 

Court Documents

15 #2

Exhibit A-1

15 #1

Exhibit A

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#6

#5

4 #2

Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement

#4

#3

#2

#1

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketAO FORM 85 mailed to counsel for Defendant Bullock Prison Health Services. (No PDF attached to this entry) (amf, ) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Wexford Health Sources, Inc.'s Special Report to Inmate 1983 Complaint by Bullock Prison Health Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1)(Piggott, Philip) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Bullock Prison Health Services. (Piggott, Philip) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Wexford Health Sources, Inc.'s ANSWER to Inmate 1983 Complaint by Bullock Prison Health Services.(Piggott, Philip) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Inmate 1983 Complaint and #6 Order signed by OH for Bullock Prison Health Services served on 7/6/2021, answer due 8/10/2021. (dmn, ) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Inmate 1983 Complaint and #6 Order signed by Jake Turnbull for Sedrick Woodget served on 7/2/2021, answer due 8/10/2021. (dmn, ) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Inmate 1983 Complaint and #6 Order signed by V. Thrasher for Patrice Richie Jones served on 7/2/2021, answer due 8/10/2021. (dmn, ) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Inmate 1983 Complaint and #6 Order signed by V. Thrasher for Aundra Jackson served on 7/2/2021, answer due 8/10/2021. (dmn, ) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Inmate 1983 Complaint and #6 Order signed by Jake Turnbull for Jeffery Baldwin served on 7/2/2021, answer due 8/10/2021. (dmn, ) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement filed in response to #3 Order by Kendell Cottrell Means. (dmn, ) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER TO FILE SPECIAL REPORT and ANSWER on or before 8/10/2021, as further set out in order; directing the clerk not to accept any pleadings, motions, or other documents submitted by Plaintiff that do not comply with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and this Order. Copies mailed to plaintiff; mailed by CMRRR with complaint to named defendants; mailed with complaint to Gen Counself or Ala Dept Corretions and counsel for Wexford Health Sources, Inc. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 7/1/2021. (djy, ) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER granting #2 application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until $350 fee is paid in full, as further set out in order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk @ Bullock County Corr Facility. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 7/1/2021. Furnished to cashier. (djy, ) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Response to #3 Order re #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Kendell Cottrell Means. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Request Slip, #2 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement)(dmn, ) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER: Although Plaintiff filed an application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, he did not submit the requisite documentation from the inmate account clerk at Bullock showing his average monthly balance and average deposits to his inmate account over the last six months. that on or before 6/28/2021 Plaintiff shall file a prison account statement from the inmate account clerk at Bullock as further set out in the order. To aid Plaintiff in his compliance with this order, the Clerk is DIRECTED to provide a copy of this order to the inmate account clerk at Bullock. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file a "Notice of Change of Address" and send a copy to Defendants upon any change in his address as further set out in the order. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 6/7/2021. Copy mailed to Inmate Account Clerk at Bullock CF as directed.(dmn, ) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Kendell Cottrell Means. (hrs, ) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Jeffery Baldwin, Bullock Prison Health Services, Aundra Jackson, Patrice Richie Jones, Sedrick Woodget, filed by Kendell Cottrell Means.(hrs, ) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Philip Piggott