This case was last updated from PACER on 03/12/2019 at 07:22:31 (UTC).

Meadows v. International Laboratories, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/11/2019 Meadows filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against International Laboratories, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kevin R. Sweazea, Gregory J. Fouratt and Martha Vazquez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00024

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Mexico District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Gregory J. Fouratt

Presiding Judges

Kevin R. Sweazea

Martha Vazquez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Luell Meadows

Defendants

International Laboratories, LLC

WalMart, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stephen F. Lawless

Attorney at Stephen F. Lawless, PA

201 Third Street Nw, Ste 500

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Defendant Attorneys

Dominic A Martinez

Attorney at Modrall Sperling Roehl Harris & Sisk, PA

Po Box 2168

Albuquerque, NM 87103-2168

Tiffany L Roach Martin

Attorney at Modrall, Sperling, Roehl, Harris & Sisk, PA

P.O. Box 2168

Albuquerque, NM 87103-2168

Rufus E. Thompson

Attorney at Modrall Sperling

P.O. Box 2168

Albuquerque, NM 87103

 

Court Documents

9 #1

Exhibit 1

#9

(#9) Transmittal of State Court Documents by WalMart, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Roach Martin, Tiffany) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

#8

(#8) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Telephonic Rule 16(c) Scheduling Conference set for 4/25/2019 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. The parties shall call the Court's conference line at (888) 363-4735 and use code 9873158 to connect to the proceedings. Joint Status Report due by 4/18/2019. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court, a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 3/1/2019. (gbg) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE by International Laboratories, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Joinder in Removal (Berger, Alissa) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by International Laboratories, LLC. (Berger, Alissa) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by WalMart, Inc. (Roach Martin, Tiffany) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

#4

(#4) Wal-Mart's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) for Negligent Dispensing of Prescription Drugs and Product Liability by WalMart, Inc.. (Roach Martin, Tiffany) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE by WalMart, Inc. of Agreed Extension of Time to File Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership's Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint (Roach Martin, Tiffany) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Removal

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WalMart, Inc. from Second Judicial District Court, case number D-202-CV-2018-08652. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by WalMart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Roach Martin, Tiffany) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2019
  • (#12) NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 10. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • (#11) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge Martha Vazquez as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Transmittal of State Court Documents by WalMart, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Roach Martin, Tiffany) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Telephonic Rule 16(c) Scheduling Conference set for 4/25/2019 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. The parties shall call the Court's conference line at (888) 363-4735 and use code 9873158 to connect to the proceedings. Joint Status Report due by 4/18/2019. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court, a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 3/1/2019. (gbg) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE by International Laboratories, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Joinder in Removal (Berger, Alissa) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by International Laboratories, LLC. (Berger, Alissa) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by WalMart, Inc. (Roach Martin, Tiffany) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Wal-Mart's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) for Negligent Dispensing of Prescription Drugs and Product Liability by WalMart, Inc.. (Roach Martin, Tiffany) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE by WalMart, Inc. of Agreed Extension of Time to File Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership's Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint (Roach Martin, Tiffany) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • (#2) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea and United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt assigned. (jg) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (jg) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6222112 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by WalMart, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Roach Martin, Tiffany) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WalMart, Inc. from Second Judicial District Court, case number D-202-CV-2018-08652. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by WalMart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Roach Martin, Tiffany) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.