Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 12:25:38 (UTC).

Meadows of Wickenburg Incorporated v. Universal Health Services Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 04/06/2020 Meadows of Wickenburg Incorporated filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Universal Health Services Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michelle H Burns and Diane J Humetewa. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00681

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Michelle H Burns

Diane J Humetewa

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Meadows of Wickenburg Incorporated

Defendants

UHS of Delaware Incorporated

Universal Health Services Incorporated

UHS of Pennsylvania Incorporated

UHS of Pennsylvania Incorporated a Pennsylvania corporation doing business as Meadows Psychiatric Center

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jennifer Joan Axel

Attorney at Polsinelli PC - Phoenix, AZ

1 E Washington St., Ste. 1200

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Miya Yusa

Attorney at Polsinelli LLP - San Francisco, CA

3 Embarcadero Ctr., Ste. 1350

San Francisco, CA 94111

Colby B Springer

Attorney at Polsinelli LLP - San Francisco, CA

3 Embarcadero Ctr., Ste. 1350

San Francisco, CA 94111

Defendant Attorneys

Nicole Maroulakos Goodwin

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig LLP - Phoenix

2375 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 700

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Nina D Boyajian

Attorney at Greenberg & Traurig LLP

2450 Colorado Ave, Ste 400E

Santa Monica, CA 90404-5524

Adrianna Griego Gorton

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig LLP - Phoenix

2375 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 700

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Ian Charles Ballon

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig LLP - E Palo Alto, CA

1900 University Ave., 5Th Fl.

East Palo Alto, CA 94303

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 5/12/2020. (LFIG) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

#16

(#16) ORDER - Defendants shall file their response to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before June 11, 2020. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 4/30/20. (EJA) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

15 #1

Consent Form

#15

(#15) Magistrate Election Form Deadline. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MAP) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

#14

(#14) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re: #1 Complaint (Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time for Defendants Universal Health Services, Inc., UHS of Delaware, Inc., and UHS of Pennsylvania, Inc. to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint) by UHS of Delaware Incorporated, UHS of Pennsylvania Incorporated, Universal Health Services Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goodwin, Nicole) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

6 #2

Summons

6 #1

Summons

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ARC) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

4 #1

AO 121

#4

(#4) MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (Attachments: #1 AO 121)(ARC) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

#3

(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18151107. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-681-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (ARC) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

2 #2

Summons

2 #1

Summons

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Submitted by Meadows of Wickenburg Incorporated. (Axel, Jennifer) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(ARC) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

1 #4

Exhibit L

1 #3

Exhibit B-K

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketRemark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Ian Charles Ballon on behalf of Defendants UHS of Delaware Incorporated, UHS of Pennsylvania Incorporated, Universal Health Services Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketRemark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Nina D Boyajian on behalf of Defendants UHS of Delaware Incorporated, UHS of Pennsylvania Incorporated, and Universal Health Services Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 5/12/2020. (LFIG) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • Docket(#19) MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Diane J Humetewa. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-20-681-PHX-DJH. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • Docket(#18) Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER - Defendants shall file their response to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before June 11, 2020. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 4/30/20. (EJA) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Magistrate Election Form Deadline. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MAP) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re: #1 Complaint (Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time for Defendants Universal Health Services, Inc., UHS of Delaware, Inc., and UHS of Pennsylvania, Inc. to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint) by UHS of Delaware Incorporated, UHS of Pennsylvania Incorporated, Universal Health Services Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goodwin, Nicole) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • Docket(#13) Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketRemark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Miya Yusa on behalf of Plaintiff Meadows of Wickenburg Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER That this case be reassigned, by lot, to another judge in the District of Arizona. FURTHER ORDERED that this matter has been reassigned by random lot to the Honorable Magistrate Judge Michelle H. Burns. All future pleadings and papers submitted for filing shall bear the following complete case number: CV-20-cv-00681-PHX-MHB. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 4/7/20. (Attachments: #1 Instructions, #2 Consent Form)(MAP) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Meadows of Wickenburg Incorporated. (Axel, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Meadows of Wickenburg Incorporated. (Axel, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Meadows of Wickenburg Incorporated. (ARC) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to UHS of Delaware Incorporated, UHS of Pennsylvania Incorporated, Universal Health Services Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(ARC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ARC) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (Attachments: #1 AO 121)(ARC) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18151107. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-681-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (ARC) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Submitted by Meadows of Wickenburg Incorporated. (Axel, Jennifer) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(ARC) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-18151107 filed by Meadows of Wickenburg Incorporated. (Axel, Jennifer) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B-K, #4 Exhibit L)(ARC) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UHS OF DELAWARE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where UNIVERSAL HEALTH SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Miya Yusa

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennifer Joan Axel