This case was last updated from PACER on 10/26/2020 at 11:49:08 (UTC).

Meade v. Walmart, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/27/2020 Meade filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Walmart, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alfred V. Covello. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01266

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Connecticut District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alfred V. Covello

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jazmyne Meade

Defendant

Walmart, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Peter M. Appleton

Attorney at Appleton & Appleton, LLC

266 Pearl Street

Hartford, CT 06103-4500

Defendant Attorneys

Katie Ann Roy

Attorney at Rogin Nassau LLC

City Place 1, 22Nd Floor, 185 Asylum Street

Hartford, CT 06103-3460

George C. Springer, Jr.

Attorney at Rogin Nassau LLC

City Place 1, 22Nd Floor, 185 Asylum Street

Hartford, CT 06103-3460

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Springer, George) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Peter M. Appleton on behalf of Jazmyne Meade ,Plaintiff (Appleton, Peter) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

11 #1

Standing Order on Removed Cases

#11

(#11) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Notice of Removal filed by Walmart, Inc., #8 Notice of Appearance filed by Walmart, Inc., #5 Notice (Other) filed by Walmart, Inc., #6 Notice (Other) filed by Walmart, Inc., #9 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #7 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Walmart, Inc., #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Walmart, Inc., #4 Notice (Other) filed by Walmart, Inc., #10 Electronic Filing Order, and #3 Answer to Complaint filed by Walmart, Inc. Signed by Clerk on 9/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases)(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

#10

(#10) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 8/27/2020.(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

#9

(#9) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/26/2020. Discovery due by 2/26/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 4/2/2021. Signed by Clerk on 8/27/2020.(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Katie Ann Roy on behalf of Walmart, Inc. (Roy, Katie) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

#7

(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Walmart, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Walmart, Inc. for Walmart, Inc.. (Springer, George) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE by Walmart, Inc. Defendant's Statement Regarding Removed Case (Springer, George) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE by Walmart, Inc. of Pending Motions (Springer, George) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE by Walmart, Inc. Certificate of Filing Copy of Notice of Removal in State Court (Springer, George) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Walmart, Inc..(Springer, George) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by George C. Springer, Jr on behalf of Walmart, Inc. (Springer, George) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walmart, Inc. from Hartford, case number HHD-CV20-6131849-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-6060065, filed by Walmart, Inc..(Springer, George) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketSet Deadlines: Discovery due by 5/27/2021; Dispositive Motions due by 6/4/2021; Trial Brief due by 7/2/2021; Trial Ready Date 8/6/2021. (Velez, F.) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • Docket(#14) SCHEDULING ORDER: discovery due by 5/7/2021; dispositive motions due by 6/4/2021; trial brief due by 7/2/2021; and trial ready date 8/6/2021. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 09/25/20. (Codeanne, K.) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Springer, George) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Peter M. Appleton on behalf of Jazmyne Meade ,Plaintiff (Appleton, Peter) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Notice of Removal filed by Walmart, Inc., #8 Notice of Appearance filed by Walmart, Inc., #5 Notice (Other) filed by Walmart, Inc., #6 Notice (Other) filed by Walmart, Inc., #9 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #7 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Walmart, Inc., #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Walmart, Inc., #4 Notice (Other) filed by Walmart, Inc., #10 Electronic Filing Order, and #3 Answer to Complaint filed by Walmart, Inc. Signed by Clerk on 9/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases)(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 8/27/2020.(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/26/2020. Discovery due by 2/26/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 4/2/2021. Signed by Clerk on 8/27/2020.(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketJudge Alfred V. Covello added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Katie Ann Roy on behalf of Walmart, Inc. (Roy, Katie) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Walmart, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Walmart, Inc. for Walmart, Inc.. (Springer, George) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE by Walmart, Inc. Defendant's Statement Regarding Removed Case (Springer, George) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE by Walmart, Inc. of Pending Motions (Springer, George) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE by Walmart, Inc. Certificate of Filing Copy of Notice of Removal in State Court (Springer, George) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Walmart, Inc..(Springer, George) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by George C. Springer, Jr on behalf of Walmart, Inc. (Springer, George) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walmart, Inc. from Hartford, case number HHD-CV20-6131849-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-6060065, filed by Walmart, Inc..(Springer, George) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less