This case was last updated from PACER on 01/14/2020 at 09:32:03 (UTC).

M.D. v. Boy Scouts of America et al

Case Summary

On 11/15/2019 M D filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Boy Scouts of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Guam District. The Judges overseeing this case are Joaquin V.E. Manibusan, Jr and Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00148

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Guam District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Joaquin V.E. Manibusan, Jr

Presiding Judge

Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

M.D.

Defendants

Boy Scouts of America Aloha Counsel Chamorro District

Boy Scouts of America

DOE Individuals 6-50, inclusive

DOE Entities 1-5

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael J. Berman

Attorney at Berman, O'Connor and Mann

Suite 503, Bank Of Guam Building, 111 Chalan Santo Papa

Hagatna, GU 96910

Defendant Attorney

G. Patrick Civille (non-CJA)

Attorney at Law Offices of Civille & Tang

330 Hernan Cortez Ave., Suite 200, 472-8868/9, Fax: 477-2511

Hagatna, GU 96910

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Complaint for Damages - Jury Trial Demanded against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PaymentDue.), filed by M.D.. Scheduling Notice due to be issued by 12/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Berman, Michael) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit 2

6 #104

(#6) Order. Status reports due by 1/6/2020. The court directs that the status reports be filed in table format, in substantially the same form as set forth in the attachments to this Order. Next Joint Status Conference set for 4/3/2020 at 08:30 AM in 4th Floor Courtroom before Chief Judge Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood and Superior Court Judge Michael J. Bordallo. Signed by Chief Judge Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood on 12/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachments A and B) (vtk) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#7

(#7) Status Report of Berman O'Connor & Mann on Sex Abuse Cases filed by M.D.. (Attachments: #1 Berman O'Connor & Mann Report)(Berman, Michael) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#2

(#2) Cover Sheet, filed by M.D..(Berman, Michael) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

7 #1

Berman O'Connor & Mann Report

6 #1

Attachments A and B

#8

(#8) Status Report by Boy Scouts of America, Boy Scouts of America Aloha Counsel Chamorro District. (Civille (non-CJA), G.) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#3

(#3) Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge. (vtk) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Status Report by Boy Scouts of America, Boy Scouts of America Aloha Counsel Chamorro District. (Civille (non-CJA), G.) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Status Report of Berman O'Connor & Mann on Sex Abuse Cases filed by M.D.. (Attachments: #1 Berman O'Connor & Mann Report)(Berman, Michael) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Order. Status reports due by 1/6/2020. The court directs that the status reports be filed in table format, in substantially the same form as set forth in the attachments to this Order. Next Joint Status Conference set for 4/3/2020 at 08:30 AM in 4th Floor Courtroom before Chief Judge Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood and Superior Court Judge Michael J. Bordallo. Signed by Chief Judge Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood on 12/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachments A and B) (vtk) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • (#4) Clerk's Notice of Deficiency. Document due: Plaintiff's Disclosure of Name and Place of Residence to be filed over the counter and under seal. Document due by 3:00 p.m. Friday, November 22, 2019. (fad, ) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • Summons Issued as to Boy Scouts of America Aloha Counsel Chamorro District. (vtk) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • Summons Issued as to Boy Scouts of America. (vtk) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Filing fee: $400.00, receipt number GUX015918 re #1 Complaint. (vtk) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge. (vtk) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Cover Sheet, filed by M.D..(Berman, Michael) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Complaint for Damages - Jury Trial Demanded against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PaymentDue.), filed by M.D.. Scheduling Notice due to be issued by 12/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Berman, Michael) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.