This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/17/2020 at 16:15:31 (UTC).

McWilliams v. United States of America

Case Summary

On 02/08/2019 McWilliams filed a Tax - Tax Claim lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Roy Percy and Glen H. Davidson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00022

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Tax Claim

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Roy Percy

Presiding Judge

Glen H. Davidson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John H. McWilliams

Drew, MS 38737-0288

Defendant

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John Holmes McWilliams

Attorney at TOWNSEND, MCWILLIAMS & HOLLADAY

P O Box 288

Drew, MS 38737-0288

Defendant Attorney

Robert Evans Dozier

Attorney at United States Department of Justice/Tax Division

555 Fourth Street, N.W., Room 6211

Washington, DC 20001

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

3 #1

Supplement Certified Mail Return sent to USAG via USDOJ

#3

#2

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice. (Dozier, Robert)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) STATUS REPORT Regarding Settlement. (Dozier, Robert)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) STATUS REPORT Regarding Settlement (Joint Report). (Dozier, Robert)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER granting #11 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 10/3/19. (cs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Joint MOTION to Stay re #10 Order on Motion for Extension of Time (Joint Motion to Stay Case Pending Consummation of Settlement) by United States of America. (Dozier, Robert)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • Reset Deadlines: United States of America answer due 10/4/2019; Plaintiff's motion to amend pleadings due by 10/4/2019. (cs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 9/5/19. (cs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time Allowed (1) the Administrator to Move for Leave to Amend His Complaint or (2) the United States to Answer or Otherwise Respond by United States of America. (Dozier, Robert)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE Continuing Case Management Conference due to Docket #8 ORDER granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Case Management Conference will be reset at later date. (cs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; United States of America answer due 9/4/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 6/5/19. (cs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond and to Upset Case Management Conference Setting by United States of America. (Dozier, Robert)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 6/24/2019 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 4/23/19. (rtc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. United States of America answer due 6/6/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 4/18/19. (cs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint or Otherwise Respond by United States of America. (Dozier, Robert)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Holmes McWilliams on behalf of John H. McWilliams All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certified Mail Return sent to USAG via USDOJ) (McWilliams, John)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Davidson and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jwr)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to United States of America. Emailed to attorney for service. (jwr)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1643168, filed by John H. McWilliams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)

    Read MoreRead Less