This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/27/2022 at 09:54:07 (UTC).

MCWHORTER v. CREDIT BUREAU OF TIFT COUNTY INC

Case Summary

On 06/28/2022 MCWHORTER filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against CREDIT BUREAU OF TIFT COUNTY INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Middle District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is TILMAN E SELF, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:22-CV-00237

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TILMAN E SELF, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROSEMARY MCWHORTER

Defendant

CREDIT BUREAU OF TIFT COUNTY INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CHRIS ARMOR

Po Box 451328

Atlanta, GA 31145

MATTHEW THOMAS BERRY

2751 Buford Hwy Ste 600

Atlanta, GA 30324

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) NOTICE CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by ROSEMARY MCWHORTER (BERRY, MATTHEW) Modified on 7/15/2022 (tam). (Entered: 07/14/2022)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to CREDIT BUREAU OF TIFT COUNTY INC. (tam) (Main Document 3 replaced on 8/12/2022 to add correct summons) (tam). (Entered: 08/11/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to CREDIT BUREAU OF TIFT COUNTY INC. (tam) (Main Document 3 replaced on 8/12/2022 to add correct summons) (tam). (Entered: 08/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by ROSEMARY MCWHORTER (BERRY, MATTHEW) Modified on 7/15/2022 (tam). (Entered: 07/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against CREDIT BUREAU OF TIFT COUNTY INC Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-4123162, $402 filed by ROSEMARY MCWHORTER (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BERRY, MATTHEW) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew T. Berry