This case was last updated from PACER on 11/08/2019 at 08:09:16 (UTC).

McWhorter et al v. Jacam Chemical Company 2013, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/09/2019 McWhorter filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Jacam Chemical Company 2013, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Dakota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Daniel L. Hovland and Clare R. Hochhalter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00189

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    North Dakota District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Daniel L. Hovland

Referral Judge

Clare R. Hochhalter

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Dirk McWhorter

Ronald Rebel

William Kainz

GeoChemicals, LLC

Defendants

Boyd Meduna

Jesse Smyle

Jacam Chemical Company 2013, LLC

Jason Biffle

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Quinn P. Fylling

Attorney at Pearce & Durick

314 E Thayer Ave, Po Box 400

Bismarck, ND 58502-0400

Kirsten H. Tuntland

Attorney at Pearce & Durick

314 E Thayer Ave, Po Box 400

Bismarck, ND 58502-0400

Zachary E. Pelham

Attorney at Pearce & Durick

314 E Thayer Ave, Po Box 400

Bismarck, ND 58502-0400

Sean D Walsh

Attorney at Hinkle Law Firm LLC

1617 North Waterfront Parkway, Ste 400

Wichita, KS 67206

Jeffrey Kuhlman

Attorney at Hinkle Law Firm LLC

1617 North Waterfront Parkway, Ste 400

Wichita, KS 67206

Mitchell Lee Herren

Attorney at Hinkle Law Firm LLC

1617 North Waterfront Parkway, Ste 400

Wichita, KS 67206

Michael J. Geiermann

Attorney at Geiermann Bergeson & Guler Law Offices

425 N. 5Th St., Po Box 2196

Bismarck, ND 58502-2196

Defendant Attorneys

Shea Ashley Thomas

Attorney at Ebeltoft Sickler Lawyers PLLC

2272 Eighth Street West

Dickinson, ND 58601

Nicholas C. Grant

Attorney at Ebeltoft Sickler Lawyers PLLC

2272 Eighth Street West

Dickinson, ND 58601

Janet Hendrick

Attorney at Phillips Murrah P.C.

3710 Rawlins Street, Suite 1420

Dallas, TX 75219

 

Court Documents

#30

(#30) REPLY to Response to Motion re #23 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by GeoChemicals, LLC, William Kainz, Dirk McWhorter, Ronald Rebel. (Pelham, Zachary) (Entered: 10/14/2019)

#28

(#28) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Janet A. Hendrick (Filing fee $150, receipt number ANDDC-1840910) by Jason Biffle, Jacam Chemical Company 2013, LLC, Boyd Meduna, Jesse Smyle. (Hendrick, Janet) Modified on 10/9/2019 to add receipt number. (rh) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

27 #1

Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Vern Disney

#27

(#27) RESPONSE to Motion re #23 MOTION to Remand to State Court Defendants' Response In Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand filed by Jacam Chemical Company 2013, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Vern Disney)(Grant, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

#25

(#25) STIPULATION to Extend Plaintiffs' Deadline to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by GeoChemicals, LLC, Ronald Rebel, Dirk McWhorter, William Kainz. (Pelham, Zachary) Modified on 10/2/2019 to add filers (cjs). (Entered: 10/01/2019)

24 #4

Exhibit D-Janet Hendrick Letter 6-3-2019

24 #3

Exhibit C-Cease and Desist Letter 5-9-2019

#24

(#24) MEMORANDUM in Support re #23 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by GeoChemicals, LLC, Dirk McWhorter, Ronald Rebel, and William Kainz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Verified Petition, #2 Exhibit B-Affidavit of Sami Wilson, #3 Exhibit C-Cease and Desist Letter 5-9-2019, #4 Exhibit D-Janet Hendrick Letter 6-3-2019)(Pelham, Zachary) Modified to add additional filers on 9/24/2019 (pb). (Entered: 09/23/2019)

#23

(#23) MOTION to Remand to State Court by GeoChemicals, LLC, Dirk McWhorter, Ronald Rebel, and William Kainz. (Pelham, Zachary) Modified add additional filers on 9/24/2019 (pb). (Entered: 09/23/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to GeoChemicals, LLC. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/24/2019. (rh) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Jason Biffle. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/24/2019. (rh) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

#3

(#3) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sean D. Walsh (Filing fee $150, receipt number 319000499) by GeoChemicals, LLC, Dirk McWhorter, Ronald Rebel. (Walsh, Sean) Modified on 9/10/2019 to add receipt number and attorney name (pb). (Entered: 09/10/2019)

#2

(#4) (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Mitchell L. Herren. (rh) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - Affidavit of Vern Disney

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - State Court Records

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jesse Smyle, Jacam Chemical Company 2013, LLC, Jason Biffle, Boyd Meduna from Stark County District Court, case number 45-2019-cv-703. Filing fee $400, receipt number 119001420. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Records, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit 3 - Affidavit of Vern Disney, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(rh) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) REPLY to Response to Motion re #23 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by GeoChemicals, LLC, William Kainz, Dirk McWhorter, Ronald Rebel. (Pelham, Zachary) (Entered: 10/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #28 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Janet A. Hendrick. (rh) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Janet A. Hendrick (Filing fee $150, receipt number ANDDC-1840910) by Jason Biffle, Jacam Chemical Company 2013, LLC, Boyd Meduna, Jesse Smyle. (Hendrick, Janet) Modified on 10/9/2019 to add receipt number. (rh) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) RESPONSE to Motion re #23 MOTION to Remand to State Court Defendants' Response In Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand filed by Jacam Chemical Company 2013, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Vern Disney)(Grant, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) (Text Only) ORDER adopting #25 Stipulation to Extend Plaintiffs' Deadline to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter.(BG) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCKET CORRECTION re: #25 Stipulation. Modified entry to reflect additional filers Dirk McWhorter, Ronald Rebel and William Kainz. (cjs) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) STIPULATION to Extend Plaintiffs' Deadline to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by GeoChemicals, LLC, Ronald Rebel, Dirk McWhorter, William Kainz. (Pelham, Zachary) Modified on 10/2/2019 to add filers (cjs). (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCKET CORRECTION re: #23 MOTION to Remand and #24 MEMORANDUM in Support. Modified entry to reflect additional filers Dirk McWhorter, Ronald Rebel, and William Kainz. (pb) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) MEMORANDUM in Support re #23 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by GeoChemicals, LLC, Dirk McWhorter, Ronald Rebel, and William Kainz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Verified Petition, #2 Exhibit B-Affidavit of Sami Wilson, #3 Exhibit C-Cease and Desist Letter 5-9-2019, #4 Exhibit D-Janet Hendrick Letter 6-3-2019)(Pelham, Zachary) Modified to add additional filers on 9/24/2019 (pb). (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) MOTION to Remand to State Court by GeoChemicals, LLC, Dirk McWhorter, Ronald Rebel, and William Kainz. (Pelham, Zachary) Modified add additional filers on 9/24/2019 (pb). (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Boyd Meduna. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/24/2019. (rh) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Dirk McWhorter. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/24/2019. (rh) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to William Kainz. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/24/2019. (rh) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Jacam Chemical Company 2013, LLC. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/24/2019. (rh) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to GeoChemicals, LLC. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/24/2019. (rh) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Jason Biffle. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/24/2019. (rh) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Mitchell L. Herren. (rh) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sean D. Walsh (Filing fee $150, receipt number 319000499) by GeoChemicals, LLC, Dirk McWhorter, Ronald Rebel. (Walsh, Sean) Modified on 9/10/2019 to add receipt number and attorney name (pb). (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Mitchell Herren (Filing fee $150, receipt number 119001424) by GeoChemicals, LLC, Dirk McWhorter, Ronald Rebel. (Herren, Mitchell) Modified on 9/10/2019 to add receipt number and attorney name. Regenerated NEF. (rh) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jesse Smyle, Jacam Chemical Company 2013, LLC, Jason Biffle, Boyd Meduna from Stark County District Court, case number 45-2019-cv-703. Filing fee $400, receipt number 119001420. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Records, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit 3 - Affidavit of Vern Disney, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(rh) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Jacam Chemicals 2013, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Janet Hendrick

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shea Ashley Thomas