This case was last updated from PACER on 08/23/2019 at 08:00:03 (UTC).

Frederick F. McSweeney v. Ygrene Energy Fund. Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/24/2019 Frederick F McSweeney filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Ygrene Energy Fund Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alka Sagar. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-05509

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alka Sagar

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Frederick F McSweeney

Defendants

Ygrene Energy Fund. Inc.

Ygrene Energy Fund California, LLC

Renew Financial Holdings,LLC

Reynaldo Adonay Franco

Haddow Alberto Weatherborne

Renew Financial Group, Inc.

Renew Financial I, Inc.

County of Los Angeles

Renew Financial I, LLC

Renew Financial Holdings, Inc

Renew Financial Group, LLC

Does 1 through 20, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Felipa R Richland

Attorney at Richland & Associates

2625 Townsgate Road, Suite 330

Westlake Village, CA 91361

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (lh) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#8

(#8) REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (hr) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

5 #1

Declaration Supplemental

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by PLAINTIFF Frederick F McSweeney, identifying FREDERICK F. McSWEENEY; YGRENE ENERGY FUND, Inc.;YGRENE ENERGY FUND CALIFORNIA, LLC; RENEW FINANCIAL GROUP, Inc.; RENEW FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC; RENEW FINANCIAL I, Inc.;RENEW FINANCIAL I LLC; RENEW FINANCIAL HOLDINGS, Inc.; RENEW FINANCIAL HOLDINGS, Inc.; COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES;REYNALDO ADONAY FRANCO; HADDOW ALBERTO WEATHERBORNE. (Richland, Felipa) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Frederick F McSweeney. (Attorney Felipa R Richland added to party Frederick F McSweeney(pty:pla))(Richland, Felipa) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Frederick F McSweeney. (Richland, Felipa) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

6 #1

CV-11C

#5

(#5) REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support By Richland filed by Plaintiff Frederick F McSweeney. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Supplemental) (Richland, Felipa) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar: granting #5 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (hr) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: A case-initiating document was submitted without payment of the full filing fee. Within two business days of this notice, counsel must pay the filing fee or file a request to proceed in forma pauperis;otherwise, the docket for this case number will be closed and no further filings will be permitted under this case number. The filing fee may be paid online by docketing the event Pay Filing Fee. (et) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (hr) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar: granting #5 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (hr) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (lh) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support By Richland filed by Plaintiff Frederick F McSweeney. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Supplemental) (Richland, Felipa) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: A case-initiating document was submitted without payment of the full filing fee. Within two business days of this notice, counsel must pay the filing fee or file a request to proceed in forma pauperis;otherwise, the docket for this case number will be closed and no further filings will be permitted under this case number. The filing fee may be paid online by docketing the event Pay Filing Fee. (et) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by PLAINTIFF Frederick F McSweeney, identifying FREDERICK F. McSWEENEY; YGRENE ENERGY FUND, Inc.;YGRENE ENERGY FUND CALIFORNIA, LLC; RENEW FINANCIAL GROUP, Inc.; RENEW FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC; RENEW FINANCIAL I, Inc.;RENEW FINANCIAL I LLC; RENEW FINANCIAL HOLDINGS, Inc.; RENEW FINANCIAL HOLDINGS, Inc.; COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES;REYNALDO ADONAY FRANCO; HADDOW ALBERTO WEATHERBORNE. (Richland, Felipa) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Frederick F McSweeney. (Richland, Felipa) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Frederick F McSweeney. (Attorney Felipa R Richland added to party Frederick F McSweeney(pty:pla))(Richland, Felipa) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.