This case was last updated from PACER on 02/09/2020 at 08:00:19 (UTC).

McSweeney v. Walker

Case Summary

On 12/11/2019 McSweeney filed a Personal Injury - Marine lawsuit against Walker. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judges overseeing this case are Donald C Coggins, Jr and Sherri A Lydon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-03448

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Marine

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Donald C Coggins, Jr

Sherri A Lydon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Teresa M McSweeney

Defendant

Peter Walker

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

S Scott Bluestein

Attorney at Bluestein Law Firm

Po Box 22253

Charleston, SC 29413

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Teresa M McSweeney. (lsut, ) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Peter Walker (filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8823014), filed by Teresa M McSweeney. (lsut, ) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Peter Walker. Service due by 3/11/2020. (lsut, ) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2020
  • Docket(#5) Case Reassigned to Judge Sherri A Lydon. Judge Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr no longer assigned to the case. (cwil, ) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Peter Walker. Service due by 3/11/2020. (lsut, ) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Teresa M McSweeney. (lsut, ) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Peter Walker (filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8823014), filed by Teresa M McSweeney. (lsut, ) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.