This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/12/2022 at 08:23:54 (UTC).

McQueen v. MetLife Auto & Home et al

Case Summary

On 06/13/2022 McQueen filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against MetLife Auto Home. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Douglas L Rayes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-01018

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Douglas L Rayes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Roxanne B McQueen

Defendants

Farmers Insurance Group

Unknown Parties

Metropolitan Group Property and Casualty Insurance Company a foreign corporation doing business as MetLife Auto & Home

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Abdoukadir Abdul Jaiteh

Elizabeth Marie Gonzalez

Defendant Attorneys

Patrick Charles Gorman

Sanford Keith Gerber

 

Court Documents

25 #1

Proposed Order

25 #25

Main Document

#24

(#24) ORDER setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 10/6/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Douglas L Rayes. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 10/6/2022. (RMV) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

#23

(#23) *ANSWER to #20 Amended Complaint, by Metropolitan Group Property and Casualty Insurance Company.(Gerber, Sanford) *Modified to reflect correct filer on 7/29/2022 (SST). (Entered: 07/26/2022)

#22

(#22) *NOTICE re: Certificate of Consultation Under L.R.12.1(C) by Metropolitan Group Property and Casualty Insurance Company . (Gerber, Sanford) *Modified to reflect correct filer on 7/29/2022 (SST). (Entered: 07/26/2022)

21 #1

Proposed Order

21 #21

Main Document

#20

(#20) *AMENDED COMPLAINT against Farmers Insurance Group, MetLife Auto & Home, Metropolitan Group Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Unknown Parties filed by Roxanne B McQueen.(Jaiteh, Abdoukadir) *Modified to reflect Local Rule violation; attorney noticed on 7/25/2022 (SST). (Entered: 07/22/2022)

#19

(#19) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Farmers Insurance Group. (Gerber, Sanford) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

7 #3

Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet

7 #1

Exhibit Ex A - C

7 #7

Main Document

#6

(#7) REDACTION to #6 Order,, Set Deadlines, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #1 Notice of Removal, #3 New Case Opened, Redacting references to minor's name by Farmers Insurance Group, MetLife Auto & Home. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - C, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Forms Corp Disclosure Stmt)(Gorman, Patrick) (Entered: 06/20/2022)

#5

(#5) ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 6/14/2022. (RMV) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Farmers Insurance Group. (MYE) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

#3

(#8) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #3 New Case Opened, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #1 Notice of Removal, by Farmers Insurance Group, MetLife Auto & Home. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gorman, Patrick) (Entered: 06/20/2022)

#2

(#8) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #3 New Case Opened, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #1 Notice of Removal, by Farmers Insurance Group, MetLife Auto & Home. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gorman, Patrick) (Entered: 06/20/2022)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

08/11/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#26) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED, pursuant to the parties' #25 Stipulation for Extension of Date for Plaintiff to file Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, the deadline for Plaintiff to respond to Defendants' #21 Motion to Dismiss is extended to and including 8/24/2022. Ordered by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 8/11/2022. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MMO) (Entered: 08/11/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#25) STIPULATION by Roxanne B McQueen. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jaiteh, Abdoukadir) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#24) ORDER setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 10/6/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Douglas L Rayes. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 10/6/2022. (RMV) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#23) *ANSWER to #20 Amended Complaint, by Metropolitan Group Property and Casualty Insurance Company.(Gerber, Sanford) *Modified to reflect correct filer on 7/29/2022 (SST). (Entered: 07/26/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#22) *NOTICE re: Certificate of Consultation Under L.R.12.1(C) by Metropolitan Group Property and Casualty Insurance Company . (Gerber, Sanford) *Modified to reflect correct filer on 7/29/2022 (SST). (Entered: 07/26/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#21) *MOTION to Dismiss Case by Farmers Insurance Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gerber, Sanford) *Modified to reflect correct filer on 7/29/2022 (SST). (Entered: 07/26/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2022

DocketRemark: Alex Matthew Romero terminated as counsel of record for noncompliance with admission procedures; party or parties represented by other admitted counsel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/22/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#20) *AMENDED COMPLAINT against Farmers Insurance Group, MetLife Auto & Home, Metropolitan Group Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Unknown Parties filed by Roxanne B McQueen.(Jaiteh, Abdoukadir) *Modified to reflect Local Rule violation; attorney noticed on 7/25/2022 (SST). (Entered: 07/22/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#19) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Farmers Insurance Group. (Gerber, Sanford) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#18) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that, by no later than July 22, 2022, Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint that redacts all references to the minor child's name in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(a)(3). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that future filings in this matter referencing the minor child shall comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(a)(3). (See Order for full details.) Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 7/19/22. (SST) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
06/23/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED granting Defendants' #8 Motion to Extend Responsive Pleading Deadline. The deadline for Defendants Farmers Insurance Group and MetLife Auto & Home to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint is extended to and including 6/28/2022. Ordered by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 6/23/2022. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MMO) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/20/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #3 New Case Opened, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #1 Notice of Removal, by Farmers Insurance Group, MetLife Auto & Home. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gorman, Patrick) (Entered: 06/20/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/20/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) REDACTION to #6 Order,, Set Deadlines, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #1 Notice of Removal, #3 New Case Opened, Redacting references to minor's name by Farmers Insurance Group, MetLife Auto & Home. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - C, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Forms Corp Disclosure Stmt)(Gorman, Patrick) (Entered: 06/20/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) ORDER that, by no later than June 20, 2022, Defendants shall file an amended Notice of Removal and attachments that redacts all references to the minor's name in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(a)(3). FURTHER ORDERED that future filings in this matter referencing the minor child shall comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(a)(3). Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 6/14/2022. (RMV) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 6/14/2022. (RMV) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Farmers Insurance Group. (MYE) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-20766375. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-1018-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MYE) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by MetLife Auto & Home (named as: Metropolitan Group Property and Casualty Insurance Company on document). (Gorman, Patrick) (MYE) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2022

Docket***STATE COURT RECORD RECEIVED*** SERVICE EXECUTED : Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, and Certificate of Arbitration upon MetLife Auto & Home on 5/16/2022. (Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 5/16/2022.) (MYE) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Entered: 06/14/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) *NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2022-050900. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number AAZDC-20766375 filed by Farmers Insurance Group, MetLife Auto & Home. (Gorman, Patrick) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A-C)(MYE) *Modified to seal pursuant to DLR Chambers on 6/14/2022 (MAP). (Entered: 06/14/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less