Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/20/2020 at 08:50:33 (UTC).

McQueen et al v. Amazon.com, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/21/2020 McQueen filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against Amazon com, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey S. White. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-02782

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeffrey S. White

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Victoria Ballinger

Mary McQueen

Defendant

Amazon.com, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ben Michael Harrington

Attorney at Hagens Berman

715 Hearst Avenue, Suite 200

Berkeley, CA 94710

Benjamin Jacob Siegel

Attorney at Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

715 Hearst Ave., Suite 202

Berkeley, CA 94710

Steve W. Berman

Attorney at Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

1301 Second Avenue, Suite 2000

Seattle, WA 98101

Defendant Attorneys

Rachel S. Brass

Attorney at Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP

555 Mission Street, Suite 3000

San Francisco, CA 94105-2933

Gregory Lawrence Doll

Attorney at Doll Amir & Eley LLP

725 S. Figueroa Street, Suite 3275

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Kristin A. Linsley, Esq.

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

555 Mission Street, Suite 3000

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) ASSOCIATION of Counsel by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Doll, Gregory) (Filed on 6/4/2020) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

#14

(#14) ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 5/7/20. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/24/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/31/2020 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2020) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

13 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#13

(#13) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 5/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2020) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

#11

(#11) STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Amazon.com, Inc., Mary McQueen and Victoria Ballinger. (Doll, Gregory) (Filed on 5/6/2020) Modified on 5/7/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/06/2020)

#10

(#10) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Victoria Ballinger, Mary McQueen.. (Harrington, Ben) (Filed on 5/5/2020) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mary McQueen, Victoria Ballinger. Amazon.com, Inc. served on 4/27/2020, answer due 5/18/2020. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/28/2020) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

7 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

#7

(#7) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14403258.) filed by Victoria Ballinger, Mary McQueen. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/23/2020) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

#6

(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/22/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/29/2020 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2020) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Amazon.com, Inc.. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2020) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Jacob Siegel (Siegel, Benjamin) (Filed on 4/22/2020) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Harrington, Ben) (Filed on 4/21/2020) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against Amazon.com, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14397656.). Filed by Mary McQueen, Victoria Ballinger. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Harrington, Ben) (Filed on 4/21/2020) Modified on 4/23/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/21/2020)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ASSOCIATION of Counsel by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Doll, Gregory) (Filed on 6/4/2020) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 5/7/20. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/24/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/31/2020 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2020) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 5/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2020) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • Docket(#12) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2020) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Amazon.com, Inc., Mary McQueen and Victoria Ballinger. (Doll, Gregory) (Filed on 5/6/2020) Modified on 5/7/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Victoria Ballinger, Mary McQueen.. (Harrington, Ben) (Filed on 5/5/2020) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mary McQueen, Victoria Ballinger. Amazon.com, Inc. served on 4/27/2020, answer due 5/18/2020. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/28/2020) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #7 Steve W. Berman's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2020) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14403258.) filed by Victoria Ballinger, Mary McQueen. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/23/2020) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/22/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/29/2020 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2020) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Amazon.com, Inc.. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2020) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Jacob Siegel (Siegel, Benjamin) (Filed on 4/22/2020) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/6/2020. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2020) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Harrington, Ben) (Filed on 4/21/2020) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against Amazon.com, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14397656.). Filed by Mary McQueen, Victoria Ballinger. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Harrington, Ben) (Filed on 4/21/2020) Modified on 4/23/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Amazon.Com, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gregory L Doll

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kristin Andrea Linsley Esq.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rachel Susan Brass