This case was last updated from PACER on 12/14/2020 at 08:38:40 (UTC).

McQuay v. USA

Case Summary

On 10/15/2020 McQuay filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against USA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alvin W. Thompson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01561

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Connecticut District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alvin W. Thompson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Amanda McQuay

Defendant

USA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Erica L Pilicy

Attorney at The Flood Law Firm, LLC

190 Washington Street

Middletown, CT 06457

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amanda McQuay. (Pilicy, Erica) (Entered: 11/11/2020)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amanda McQuay. (Pilicy, Erica) (Entered: 11/11/2020)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amanda McQuay. All Defendants. (Pilicy, Erica) (Entered: 11/11/2020)

#7

(#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *USA* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Erica L Pilicy* *The Flood Law Firm, LLC* *190 Washington Street* *Middletown, CT 06457*. (Agati, Kathryn) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Notice of Appearance filed by Amanda McQuay, #2 Complaint filed by Amanda McQuay, #5 Standing Protective Order, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Electronic Filing Order. Signed by Clerk on 10/16/2020. (Agati, Kathryn) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

#5

(#5) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 10/15/2020. (Agati, Kathryn) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

#4

(#4) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 10/15/2020. (Agati, Kathryn) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

#3

(#3) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/14/2020, Discovery due by 4/16/2021, Dispositive Motions due by 5/21/2021. Signed by Clerk on 10/15/2020. (Agati, Kathryn) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against USA, filed by Amanda McQuay.(Hushin, Z.) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

#1

(#1) NOTICE of Appearance by Erica L Pilicy on behalf of Amanda McQuay (Pilicy, Erica) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amanda McQuay. (Pilicy, Erica) (Entered: 11/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amanda McQuay. (Pilicy, Erica) (Entered: 11/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amanda McQuay. All Defendants. (Pilicy, Erica) (Entered: 11/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *USA* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Erica L Pilicy* *The Flood Law Firm, LLC* *190 Washington Street* *Middletown, CT 06457*. (Agati, Kathryn) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Notice of Appearance filed by Amanda McQuay, #2 Complaint filed by Amanda McQuay, #5 Standing Protective Order, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Electronic Filing Order. Signed by Clerk on 10/16/2020. (Agati, Kathryn) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 10/15/2020. (Agati, Kathryn) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 10/15/2020. (Agati, Kathryn) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/14/2020, Discovery due by 4/16/2021, Dispositive Motions due by 5/21/2021. Signed by Clerk on 10/15/2020. (Agati, Kathryn) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketJudge Alvin W. Thompson added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketFiling fee received from Pilicy, Erica L: $ 400, receipt number ACTDC-6158146 (Hushin, Z.) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against USA, filed by Amanda McQuay.(Hushin, Z.) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of Appearance by Erica L Pilicy on behalf of Amanda McQuay (Pilicy, Erica) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketRequest for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Pilicy, Erica) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less