This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/30/2022 at 08:28:22 (UTC).

McQuaid v. Wetzel et al

Case Summary

On 12/01/2021 McQuaid filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Wetzel. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is William I. Arbuckle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-02019

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William I. Arbuckle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joseph A. McQuaid

Defendants

John Wetzel

Laurel Harry

John/Jane Does 1 - 10

Sergeant Fletcher

Specialist Kristie Gerson

Specialist Robert Wimer

Nurse Practitioner Kevin Wanga

Dr. Saiqa Mushtaq, MD

MHM Correctional Services, LLC d/b/a MHM Solutions

Correct Care Solutions, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Peter A Greiner

Attorney at Zarwin Baum DeVito Kaplan Schaer & Toddy

2005 Market Street, 16Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Defendant Attorneys

Nicole J. Boland

Attorney at Office of Attorney General

15Th Floor

Harrisburg, PA 17120

Cassidy L Neal

Attorney at Matis Baum O'Connor, P.C.

912 Fort Duquesne Blvd.

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Caitlin J Goodrich

Attorney at Weber Gallagher Simpson Stapleton Fires & Newby, LLP

Four Ppg Place, 5Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

 

Court Documents

#26

(#26) ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Commonwealth Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time (Doc. 20) is GRANTED. The Commonwealth Defendants' Responsive Pleading is now due on or before 2/25/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge William I. Arbuckle on 1/28/2022. (caw) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

#25

(#25) CERTIFICATE of Certificate of Merit by Joseph A. McQuaid . (Greiner, Peter) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

#24

(#24) CERTIFICATE of Certificate of Merit by Joseph A. McQuaid . (Greiner, Peter) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

#23

(#23) CERTIFICATE of Certificate of Merit by Joseph A. McQuaid . (Greiner, Peter) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

#22

(#22) CERTIFICATE of Certificate of Merit by Joseph A. McQuaid . (Greiner, Peter) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

#21

(#21) CERTIFICATE of Certificate of Merit by Joseph A. McQuaid . (Greiner, Peter) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

20 #1

Proposed Order

#20

(#20) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to to File Responsive Pleading by Fletcher, Kristie Gerson, Laurel Harry, John Wetzel, Robert Wimer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Boland, Nicole) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

#19

(#19) NOTICE by MHM Correctional Services, LLC, Saiqa Mushtaq, MD, Kevin Wanga Notice of Intention to Enter Judgment of Non Pros/Move to Dismiss Professional Liability Claim (Neal, Cassidy) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

#3

(#3) Summons Re-issued (plaintiff's counsel change of address) as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s) in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (lg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/7/2021: #1 MJ plaintiff packet) (lg). (Entered: 12/07/2021)

2 #1

Summons Packet

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (nr) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D - Online article re prison suicide

1 #3

Exhibit C - Investigation of Solitary Confinement

1 #2

Exhibit B - Notice of Expanded Investigation

1 #1

Exhibit A - Disability Rights Network of PA Complaint

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Correct Care Solutions, LLC, Fletcher, Kristie Gerson, Laurel Harry, John/Jane Does 1 - 10(Medical Providers), John/Jane Does 1 - 10(Correctional Officers), MHM Correctional Services, LLC, Saiqa Mushtaq, MD, Kevin Wanga, John Wetzel, Robert Wimer ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number 5772800), filed by Joseph A. McQuaid. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Disability Rights Network of PA Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Expanded Investigation, #3 Exhibit C - Investigation of Solitary Confinement, #4 Exhibit D - Online article re prison suicide, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(nr) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Commonwealth Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time (Doc. 20) is GRANTED. The Commonwealth Defendants' Responsive Pleading is now due on or before 2/25/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge William I. Arbuckle on 1/28/2022. (caw) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) CERTIFICATE of Certificate of Merit by Joseph A. McQuaid . (Greiner, Peter) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) CERTIFICATE of Certificate of Merit by Joseph A. McQuaid . (Greiner, Peter) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) CERTIFICATE of Certificate of Merit by Joseph A. McQuaid . (Greiner, Peter) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) CERTIFICATE of Certificate of Merit by Joseph A. McQuaid . (Greiner, Peter) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) CERTIFICATE of Certificate of Merit by Joseph A. McQuaid . (Greiner, Peter) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to to File Responsive Pleading by Fletcher, Kristie Gerson, Laurel Harry, John Wetzel, Robert Wimer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Boland, Nicole) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE by MHM Correctional Services, LLC, Saiqa Mushtaq, MD, Kevin Wanga Notice of Intention to Enter Judgment of Non Pros/Move to Dismiss Professional Liability Claim (Neal, Cassidy) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on MHM Correctional Services, LLC d/b/a MHM Solutions on 12/16/2021, filed by Joseph A. McQuaid. (Greiner, Peter) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Correct Care Solutions, LLC n/k/a Wellpath, LLC on 12/20/2021, filed by Joseph A. McQuaid. (Greiner, Peter) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on John Wetzel on 12/20/2021, filed by Joseph A. McQuaid. (Greiner, Peter) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Correct Care Solutions, LLC. Correct Care Solutions, LLC waiver sent on 12/14/2021, answer due 2/14/2022. (Goodrich, Caitlin) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Caitlin J Goodrich on behalf of Correct Care Solutions, LLC (Goodrich, Caitlin) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by MHM Correctional Services, LLC. MHM Correctional Services, LLC waiver sent on 12/7/2021, answer due 2/7/2022. (Neal, Cassidy) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Saiqa Mushtaq, MD. Saiqa Mushtaq, MD waiver sent on 12/7/2021, answer due 2/7/2022. (Neal, Cassidy) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Kevin Wanga. Kevin Wanga waiver sent on 12/7/2021, answer due 2/7/2022. (Neal, Cassidy) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Cassidy L Neal on behalf of MHM Correctional Services, LLC, Saiqa Mushtaq, MD, Kevin Wanga (Neal, Cassidy) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Re-issued (plaintiff's counsel change of address) as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s) in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (lg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/7/2021: #1 MJ plaintiff packet) (lg). (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (nr) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Correct Care Solutions, LLC, Fletcher, Kristie Gerson, Laurel Harry, John/Jane Does 1 - 10(Medical Providers), John/Jane Does 1 - 10(Correctional Officers), MHM Correctional Services, LLC, Saiqa Mushtaq, MD, Kevin Wanga, John Wetzel, Robert Wimer ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number 5772800), filed by Joseph A. McQuaid. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Disability Rights Network of PA Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Expanded Investigation, #3 Exhibit C - Investigation of Solitary Confinement, #4 Exhibit D - Online article re prison suicide, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(nr) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MHM CORRECTIONAL SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases where CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nicole J. Boland Esq.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Caitlin J. Goodrich Esq.