This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/19/2021 at 08:05:45 (UTC).

McPherson v. Cook Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 09/20/2021 McPherson filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Cook Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles J. Siragusa. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-06593

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles J. Siragusa

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John H. McPherson

Defendants

Cook Incorporated

Cook Medical Incorporated

Cook Group Incorporated

Cook Medical, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Laura J. Baughman

Attorney at Martin Baughman, PLLC

3141 Hood Streetsuite 600

Dallas, TX 75219

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Proposed Summons For Cook Incorporated

1 #3

Proposed Summons For Group Group Incorporated

1 #4

Proposed Summons For Cook Medical, Incorporated

1 #5

Proposed Summons, For Cook Medical, LLC

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Cook Group Incorporated, Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical Incorporated, Cook Medical, LLC, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (TMK) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

#3

(#3) MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER. Signed by Clerk of the Panel on 9/30/2021. (TF) (Main Document 3 replaced on 9/30/2021) (TF). (Entered: 09/30/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketCase transferred and has been opened in Southern District of Indiana as case 1:21-cv-06615, filed 09/30/2021. (KM) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER. Signed by Clerk of the Panel on 9/30/2021. (TF) (Main Document 3 replaced on 9/30/2021) (TF). (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketNotified Multi-District Litigation Panel of potential tag-along case. (TMK) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Cook Group Incorporated, Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical Incorporated, Cook Medical, LLC, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (TMK) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TMK) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketAUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(TMK) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Hon. Charles J. Siragusa. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (TMK) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Cook Group Incorporated, Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical Incorporated, Cook Medical, LLC $ 402 receipt number 0209-4365181, filed by John H. McPherson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons For Cook Incorporated, #3 Proposed Summons For Group Group Incorporated, #4 Proposed Summons For Cook Medical, Incorporated, #5 Proposed Summons, For Cook Medical, LLC)(Baughman, Laura) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COOK GROUP INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases where COOK MEDICAL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where COOK INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Laura J Baughman