This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/09/2022 at 07:06:56 (UTC).

mCom IP LLC v. CIBC Bank USA

Case Summary

On 03/10/2022 mCom IP LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against CIBC Bank USA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Jane J Boyle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00574

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jane J Boyle

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MCOM IP, LLC

mCom IP LLC

Defendant

CIBC Bank USA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William P Ramey, III

Attorney at Ramey LLP

5020 Montose Blvd, Suite 800

Houston, TX 77006

Kyril Vladimir Talanov

Attorney at Admad Zavitsanos Anaipakos Alavi & Mensing PC

1221 Mckinney Street, Suite 2500

Houston, TX 77010

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against CIBC Bank USA filed by MCOM IP, LLC. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-12661054) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B US8862508, #3 Cover Sheet) (Ramey, William) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

1 #1

Exhibit(s) A

1 #2

Exhibit(s) B US8862508

1 #3

Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) NOTICE of AO120 filed by MCOM IP, LLC (Ramey, William) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by MCOM IP, LLC. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

#4

(#4) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

#5

(#5) Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (oyh) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to CIBC Bank USA. (oyh) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

#7

(#7) STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL Voluntary by mCom IP LLC. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

#8

(#8) Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Final Order. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (ndt) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ELECTRONIC ORDER: Pursuant to #7 Voluntary Stipulation of Dismissal, all claims asserted in this action by Plaintiff against Defendant CIBC Bank USA are hereby dismissed without prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs and fees. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 3/15/2022) (chmb) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Final Order. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (ndt) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated per #7 Voluntary Stipulation of Dismissal. The clerk will prepare the final Report to the Patent/Trademark or Copyright Office. (ndt) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL Voluntary by mCom IP LLC. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to CIBC Bank USA. (oyh) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (oyh) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by MCOM IP, LLC. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of AO120 filed by MCOM IP, LLC (Ramey, William) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against CIBC Bank USA filed by MCOM IP, LLC. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-12661054) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B US8862508, #3 Cover Sheet) (Ramey, William) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MCOM IP, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William P. Ramey, III