This case was last updated from PACER on 07/20/2019 at 07:12:49 (UTC).

McNeill v. Porter-Cable Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 05/21/2019 McNeill filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Porter-Cable Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is George A. OToole, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-11156

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George A. OToole, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Scott McNeill

Defendants

Rexon Industrial Corp., Ltd.

Porter-Cable Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Douglas C. DuFault, Jr.

Attorney at Douglas C. Dufault, Jr., P.C.

Suite # 4, 250 East Main Street

Norton, MA 02766

Defendant Attorneys

Andrea Studley Knowles

Attorney at Sugarman, Rogers, Barshak & Cohen, P.C.

101 Merrimac Street, 9Th Floor

Boston, MA 02114

Richard A. Schuster

Attorney at Matthiesen, Wickert & Lehrer, S.C.

1111 E. Sumner Street, P.O. Box 270670

Hartford, WI 53027

 

Court Documents

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet Category Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Rexon Industrial Corp., Ltd. ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7695738 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Category Sheet)(Knowles, Andrea) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Studley Knowles on behalf of Rexon Industrial Corp., Ltd. (Knowles, Andrea) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Rexon Industrial Corp., Ltd.. (Knowles, Andrea) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

#4

(#4) General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (McDonagh, Christina) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

#7

(#8) Judge George A. O'Toole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #7 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to June 21, 2019 to File Response to the Complaint (Halley, Taylor) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

#10

(#10) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Scott McNeill.(DuFault, Douglas) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

#19

(#19) Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to August 30, 2019 to File Response/Reply to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Scott McNeill.(DuFault, Douglas) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

#18

(#18) Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to October 9, 2019 to Make Service of Process by Scott McNeill.(DuFault, Douglas) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

#15

(#15) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Rexon Industrial Corp., Ltd..(Schuster, Richard) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

#17

(#17) DECLARATION re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction OF JEFF CHEN by Rexon Industrial Corp., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh 1, Invoice, Packing Slip and PO [REDACTED PORTIONS])(Schuster, Richard) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

17 #1

Exhibit Exh 1, Invoice, Packing Slip and PO [REDACTED PORTIONS]

#16

(#16) MEMORANDUM in Support re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Rexon Industrial Corp., Ltd.. (Schuster, Richard) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

#14

(#14) STATE COURT Record. (Knowles, Andrea) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

#12

(#12) Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Richard A. Schuster Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7716465 by Rexon Industrial Corp., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Knowles, Andrea) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) Judge George A. O'Toole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #19 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to August 30, 2019 to File Response/Reply to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Halley, Taylor) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Judge George A. O'Toole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #18 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to October 9, 2019 to Make Service of Process (Halley, Taylor) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to August 30, 2019 to File Response/Reply to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Scott McNeill.(DuFault, Douglas) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to October 9, 2019 to Make Service of Process by Scott McNeill.(DuFault, Douglas) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) DECLARATION re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction OF JEFF CHEN by Rexon Industrial Corp., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh 1, Invoice, Packing Slip and PO [REDACTED PORTIONS])(Schuster, Richard) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MEMORANDUM in Support re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Rexon Industrial Corp., Ltd.. (Schuster, Richard) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Rexon Industrial Corp., Ltd..(Schuster, Richard) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) STATE COURT Record. (Knowles, Andrea) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Judge George A. O'Toole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Richard A. Schuster. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Halley, Taylor) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Richard A. Schuster Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7716465 by Rexon Industrial Corp., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Knowles, Andrea) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Scott McNeill.(DuFault, Douglas) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • (#9) Reset Deadlines: Rexon Industrial Corp., Ltd. Answer Due 6/21/2019. (Halley, Taylor) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Judge George A. O'Toole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #7 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to June 21, 2019 to File Response to the Complaint (Halley, Taylor) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to June 21, 2019 to File Response to the Complaint by Rexon Industrial Corp., Ltd..(Knowles, Andrea) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • (#6) Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (McDonagh, Christina) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • (#5) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge George A. OToole, Jr assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (McDonagh, Christina) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Rexon Industrial Corp., Ltd.. (Knowles, Andrea) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Studley Knowles on behalf of Rexon Industrial Corp., Ltd. (Knowles, Andrea) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Rexon Industrial Corp., Ltd. ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7695738 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Category Sheet)(Knowles, Andrea) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.