This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/23/2021 at 08:13:06 (UTC).

McNealy v. Johnson et al

Case Summary

On 09/24/2021 McNealy filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Johnson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael L. Brown. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-03957

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael L. Brown

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Antonio McNealy

Defendants

Raynita Johnson

Del Mar Holding, LLC

Liberty Mutual Insurance Company

Helmsman Management Services, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James D. Freeman

Attorney at Mark A. Nestor & Associates LLC

3867 Holcomb Bridge Roadsuite 500

Norcross, GA 30092

Mark Anderst Nestor

Attorney at Mark A. Nestor, Attorney at Law

3680 Holcomb Bridge Roadsuite 150

Peachtree Corners, GA 30092

Defendant Attorneys

Burke Anthony Noble

Attorney at Drew Eckl & Farnham - ATL

Suite 3500303 Peachtree St., Ne

Atlanta, GA 30308

Stevan Anthony Miller

Attorney at Drew Eckl & Farnham - ATL

Suite 3500303 Peachtree St., Ne

Atlanta, GA 30308

 

Court Documents

8 #1

Exhibit A

#8

(#8) MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by Del Mar Holding, LLC, Helmsman Management Services, LLC, Raynita Johnson, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Noble, Burke) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

7 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 2

7 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1

#7

(#7) REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Font Complaince with Cert of Service filed by Antonio McNealy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Freeman, James) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

6 #1

Exhibit A - Affidavit

#6

(#6) RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Font Complaince with Cert of Service filed by Del Mar Holding, LLC, Helmsman Management Services, LLC, Raynita Johnson, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit)(Noble, Burke) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

5 #1

Brief

#5

(#5) MOTION to Remand to State Court and Font Complaince with Cert of Service with Brief In Support by Antonio McNealy. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Freeman, James) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

#4

#3

#2

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C Affidavit of Kristen M. Olguin

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by Del Mar Holding, LLC, Helmsman Management Services, LLC, Raynita Johnson, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Noble, Burke) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Font Complaince with Cert of Service, to District Judge Michael L. Brown. (dob) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Font Complaince with Cert of Service filed by Antonio McNealy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Freeman, James) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Font Complaince with Cert of Service filed by Del Mar Holding, LLC, Helmsman Management Services, LLC, Raynita Johnson, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit)(Noble, Burke) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Remand to State Court and Font Complaince with Cert of Service with Brief In Support by Antonio McNealy. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Freeman, James) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Del Mar Holding, LLC, Helmsman Management Services, LLC, Raynita Johnson, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc.\, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group. Inc for Liberty Mutual Insurance Company; Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Corporate Services, LLC for Helmsman Management Services, LLC. (Noble, Burke) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Del Mar Holding, LLC, Helmsman Management Services, LLC, Raynita Johnson, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. Discovery ends on 2/28/2022.(Noble, Burke) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION edited filed date re #1 Notice of Removal. (vs) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) STANDING ORDER regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 8/26/2021. (jpk) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGANDC-11283134) filed by Del Mar Holding, LLC, Raynita Johnson, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Helmsman Management Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A State Court complaint, #2 Exhibit B Notice of Filing, #3 Exhibit C Affidavit of Kristen M. Olguin, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(vs) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 10/1/2021 to correct filed date (vs). (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HELMSMAN MANAGEMENT SERVICES LLC ON BEHALF OF ADP TOTALSOURCE FL XVI INC. / GLOBAL INTEGRITY MAINTENANCE is a litigant

Latest cases where Liberty Mutual Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stevan Anthony Miller