This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 08:27:51 (UTC).

MCNEAL v. USA

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence case was filed by MCNEAL against USA in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03607

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

James R. Sweeney II

 

Party Details

Petitioner

AARON MCNEAL

Respondent

USA

 

Court Documents

2 #4

Envelope

#5

(#5) First MOTION for Extension of Time to January 9, 2020 in which to #3 Order to Show Cause , filed by Respondent USA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Preston, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

2 #1

Exhibit A - Declaration of Aaron McNeal

1 #2

Envelope

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#6

(#6) ORDER - This matter is before the Court on the Respondent's motion for a ninety (90) day extension of time to respond to the Petitioner's motion pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2255. The Court, being duly advised in the premises, now GRANTS the motion, dkt. #5 , finding it to be made for good cause. The Respondent shall have to and including January 9, 2020, to file its response to the 2255 motion. (Copy to Petitioner via U.S. mail) Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 10/4/2019. (JDC) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

#3

(#3) Order to Show Cause - The clerk shall forward a copy of this Entry to the United States Attorney for this District. The United States is notified of the filing of the petitioner's motion for relief and memorandum in support pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2255. The United States shall have until October 9, 2019, in which to answer the allegations of the motion for relief pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2255, and the petitioner shall have twenty-eight (28) calendar days after service of the answer in which to reply. If the United States' answer refers to briefs, filings, or transcripts of the prior proceedings that are not available in the Court's electronic records, the United States is directed to furnish them along with its answer. See Rule 5(c) of the Rules Governing Section 2255 Proceedings. Any motion for an extension of time to file an answer should include a statement notifying the Court whether and when a request for production of transcripts has been made to the court reporter. Any motion for an extension of time filed by the respondent must include the petitioner's current earliest possible release date. (Copy to Petitioner via U.S. mail) Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 8/29/2019.(JDC) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

#2

(#2) BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support, re #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Petitioner AARON MCNEAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Aaron McNeal, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Erik Khan, #3 Exhibit C - Petition and Plea Agreement, #4 Envelope)(REO) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

2 #3

Exhibit C - Petition and Plea Agreement

5 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey D. Preston on behalf of Respondent USA. (Preston, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

2 #2

Exhibit B - Declaration of Erik Khan

#1

(#1) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by AARON MCNEAL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(REO) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER - This matter is before the Court on the Respondent's motion for a ninety (90) day extension of time to respond to the Petitioner's motion pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2255. The Court, being duly advised in the premises, now GRANTS the motion, dkt. #5 , finding it to be made for good cause. The Respondent shall have to and including January 9, 2020, to file its response to the 2255 motion. (Copy to Petitioner via U.S. mail) Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 10/4/2019. (JDC) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) First MOTION for Extension of Time to January 9, 2020 in which to #3 Order to Show Cause , filed by Respondent USA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Preston, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey D. Preston on behalf of Respondent USA. (Preston, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Order to Show Cause - The clerk shall forward a copy of this Entry to the United States Attorney for this District. The United States is notified of the filing of the petitioner's motion for relief and memorandum in support pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2255. The United States shall have until October 9, 2019, in which to answer the allegations of the motion for relief pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2255, and the petitioner shall have twenty-eight (28) calendar days after service of the answer in which to reply. If the United States' answer refers to briefs, filings, or transcripts of the prior proceedings that are not available in the Court's electronic records, the United States is directed to furnish them along with its answer. See Rule 5(c) of the Rules Governing Section 2255 Proceedings. Any motion for an extension of time to file an answer should include a statement notifying the Court whether and when a request for production of transcripts has been made to the court reporter. Any motion for an extension of time filed by the respondent must include the petitioner's current earliest possible release date. (Copy to Petitioner via U.S. mail) Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 8/29/2019.(JDC) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support, re #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Petitioner AARON MCNEAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Aaron McNeal, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Erik Khan, #3 Exhibit C - Petition and Plea Agreement, #4 Envelope)(REO) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by AARON MCNEAL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(REO) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.