This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/21/2021 at 08:55:25 (UTC).

McNeal v. Navy Federal Credit Union et al

Case Summary

On 07/23/2021 McNeal filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Navy Federal Credit Union. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Leigh Martin May and J. Clay Fuller. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02968

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leigh Martin May

Referral Judge

J. Clay Fuller

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sonya Youvett McNeal

Ellenwood, GA 30294

Defendants

Navy Federal Credit Union

CSC Corporation Service Company

Fiserv Solutions, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Matthew Scott Knoop

Attorney at Polsinelli, P.C.-GA

Suite 1100, 1201 West Peachtree Street, Nw

Atlanta, GA 30309

 

Court Documents

#2

RESTRICTED

#3

#4

4 #1

Brief Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Fiserv Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Knoop, Matthew) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fiserv Solutions, LLC.(Knoop, Matthew) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) doc filed in error AMENDED COMPLAINT and Request for Injunction against Navy Federal Credit Union, Fiserv Solutions, LLC filed by Sonya Youvett McNeal.(rjc) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 8/23/2021 (rjc). (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller. (eop) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Sonya Youvett McNeal. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/23/2021: #3 Amended Complaint) (rjc). (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fiserv Solutions is a litigant

Latest cases where Navy Federal Credit Union Long Term Disability Plan is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew S Knoop