This case was last updated from PACER on 10/14/2021 at 07:28:08 (UTC).

MCNEAL, JR. v. TRANS UNION, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 10/12/2021 MCNEAL, JR filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against TRANS UNION, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard L. Young and Mark J. Dinsmore. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00149

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard L. Young

Referral Judge

Mark J. Dinsmore

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TYDELL JEROME MCNEAL, JR.

Evansville, IN 47714

Defendants

TRANS UNION, LLC

EQUIFAX

EXPERIAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew M. Lehmann

Attorney at SCHUCKIT & ASSOCIATES P.C.

4545 Northwestern Drive

Zionsville, IN 46077

Taylor Ann Decker

Attorney at SCHUCKIT & ASSOCIATES P.C.

4545 Northwestern Drive

Zionsville, IN 46077

Brandon Stein

Attorney at SEYFARTH SHAW LLP (Chicago)

233 South Wacker Drive, Suite 8000

Chicago, IL 60606-6448

Steven D. Brock

Attorney at CLARK HILL PLC

151 South Old Woodward Avenue, Suite 200

Birmingham, MI 48009

Callie Marie Barr

Attorney at JONES DAY

150 West Jefferson, Suite 2100

Detriot, MI 48226

 

Court Documents

#19

#18

17 #1

Brief in Support of Motion for More Definite Statement

#17

#16

#15

14 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO EVANSVILLE DIVISION - Defendant Trans Union, LLC, removed this case from the Superior Court, Small Claims Division, of Vanderburgh County, Indiana. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1441(a), the case should have been removed to "the district court of the United States for the district and division embracing the place where such action is pending," which in this case is the Evansville Division of this district. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a), "[t]he district court of a district in which is filed a case laying venue in the wrong division... shall dismiss, or if it be in the interest of justice, transfer such case to any... division in which it could have been brought." The Court determines that it is in the interests of justice to transfer this case to the proper division rather than to dismiss it. Accordingly, the Clerk is directed to transfer this case to the Evansville Division. The assigned judicial officers shall remain the same. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 10/12/2021.(SWM) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by EQUIFAX (Brock, Steven) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION for More Definite Statement , filed by Defendant EQUIFAX. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion for More Definite Statement)(Brock, Steven) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL SCHEDULE AND DISCUSSING DISCOVERY: This Order sets the schedule for how this action shall proceed. Part I sets forth the pretrial deadlines. Part II discusses various aspects of discovery. Facilitating the discovery process can be difficult, and this Order is issued in an effort to help explain and streamline the process for the parties. The parties should carefully read this Order. *SEE ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION*. Dispositive Motions due by 6/3/2022. Discovery due by 5/6/2022.Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 9/10/2021.(SWM) Modified on 9/13/2021 (GD). (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER granting #14 Motion to Withdraw Attorney Appearance. Attorney Brandon Stein withdrawn. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 9/10/2021. (SWM) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION to Withdraw Attorney Appearance , filed by Defendant EQUIFAX. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stein, Brandon) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Steven D. Brock on behalf of Defendant EQUIFAX. (Brock, Steven) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement by EXPERIAN. (Barr, Callie) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, filed by EXPERIAN.(Barr, Callie) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Callie Marie Barr on behalf of Defendant EXPERIAN. (Barr, Callie) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, filed by TRANS UNION, LLC.(Decker, Taylor) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by EQUIFAX identifying Corporate Parent EQUIFAX INC. for EQUIFAX.. (Stein, Brandon) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time re Filing a response to pleading defined by Fed. R. Civ. P. 7(a), filed by Defendant EQUIFAX. (Stein, Brandon) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon Stein on behalf of Defendant EQUIFAX. (Stein, Brandon) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor Ann Decker on behalf of Defendant TRANS UNION, LLC. (Decker, Taylor) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by TRANS UNION, LLC identifying Corporate Parent TRANSUNION INTERMEDIATE HOLDINGS, INC., Corporate Parent TRANSUNION, Other Affiliate T. ROWE PRICE GROUP, INC. for TRANS UNION, LLC.. (Lehmann, Andrew) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew M. Lehmann on behalf of Defendant TRANS UNION, LLC. (Lehmann, Andrew) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court, Small Claims, Vanderburgh County, case number 82D07-2107-SC-005530, filed by TRANS UNION, LLC. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0756-6696572) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Statement of Claim and Summons, #2 Exhibit B-Equifax's Consent to Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lehmann, Andrew) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Experian is a litigant

Latest cases where EQUIFAX INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Trans Union Corp is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Callie Barr