This case was last updated from PACER on 06/15/2020 at 09:40:21 (UTC).

McNaughten v. AT&T Inc

Case Summary

On 04/16/2020 McNaughten filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against AT T Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sam A. Lindsay. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00936

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sam A. Lindsay

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brenda McNaughten

Defendant

AT&T Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Dimple Abraham Baca

Attorney at Jackson Spencer Law PLLC

12221 Meit Drive, Suite 160

Dallas, TX 75251

Jennifer J Spencer

Attorney at Jackson Spencer Law PLLC

12221 Merit Dr., Suite 160

Dallas, TX 75251

James E Hunnicutt

Attorney at Jackson Spencer Law PLLC

12221 Merit Dr., Suite 160

Dallas, TX 75251

Defendant Attorneys

Stacey Cho Hernandez

Attorney at Carter Arnett PLLC

8150 N Central Expressway, Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75206

Courtney Barksdale Perez

Attorney at Carter Arnett PLLC

8150 N. Central Expressway, Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75206

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AT&T Inc. (Hernandez, Stacey) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

10 #2

Exhibit(s) Exhibit B

10 #1

Exhibit(s) Exhibit A

9 #1

Exhibit(s) Exhibit A

#9

(#9) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings or, in the Alternative, Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss filed by AT&T Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A)Attorney Stacey Cho Hernandez added to party AT&T Inc(pty:dft) (Hernandez, Stacey) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to AT&T Inc ; served on 4/24/2020. (Hunnicutt, James) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

6 #1

Proposed Order

#6

(#6) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by AT&T Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Courtney Barksdale Perez added to party AT&T Inc(pty:dft) (Perez, Courtney) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Brenda McNaughten. (Hunnicutt, James) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to AT&T Inc. (oyh) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

#2

(#2) Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Brenda McNaughten. (Spencer, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against AT&T, Inc. filed by Brenda McNaughten. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10772581) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Spencer, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AT&T Inc. (Hernandez, Stacey) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, filed by AT&T Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B) (Hernandez, Stacey) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings or, in the Alternative, Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss filed by AT&T Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A)Attorney Stacey Cho Hernandez added to party AT&T Inc(pty:dft) (Hernandez, Stacey) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to AT&T Inc ; served on 4/24/2020. (Hunnicutt, James) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time. Accordingly, the deadline for Defendant AT&T Inc to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is 5/29/2020. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 5/14/2020) (chmb) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by AT&T Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Courtney Barksdale Perez added to party AT&T Inc(pty:dft) (Perez, Courtney) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Brenda McNaughten. (Hunnicutt, James) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to AT&T Inc. (oyh) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Brenda McNaughten. (Spencer, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against AT&T, Inc. filed by Brenda McNaughten. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10772581) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Spencer, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less