This case was last updated from PACER on 09/06/2021 at 10:32:55 (UTC).

McNamara v. Wells Fargo & Company et al

Case Summary

On 07/08/2021 McNamara filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Wells Fargo Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Larry Alan Burns, Linda Lopez, Anthony J. Battaglia and Jill L. Burkhardt. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-01245

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Larry Alan Burns

Anthony J. Battaglia

Referral Judges

Linda Lopez

Jill L. Burkhardt

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Thomas W. McNamara

Defendants

Wells Fargo & Company

Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Cornelia J.B. Gordon

Attorney at McNamara Smith LLP

655 West Broadway, Suite 900

San Diego, CA 92101

Jonathan M. Rotter

Attorney at Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP

1925 Century Park East, Suite 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Logan Daniel Smith

Attorney at McNamara Smith LLP

655 West Broadway, Suite 900

San Diego, CA 92101

Garth A. Spencer

Attorney at Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP

1925 Century Park East, Suite 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Lionel Z Glancy

Attorney at Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP

1925 Century Park East, Suite 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendant Attorneys

Alicia A. Baiardo

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

Two Embarcadero Center, Suite 1300

San Francisco, CA 94111

Anthony Q Le

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

Two Embarcadero Center, Suite 1300

San Francisco, CA 94111

David C. Powell

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

Two Embarcadero Center, Suite 1300

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

14 #5

Exhibit C to Request for Judicial Notice

14 #4

Exhibit B to Request for Judicial Notice

14 #3

Exhibit A to Request for Judicial Notice

14 #2

Request for Judicial Notice

14 #1

Memo of Points and Authorities

14 #14

Main Document

#13

(#13) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A... (Le, Anthony) (sjt). (Entered: 08/05/2021)

#12

(#12) ORDER granting #9 Stipulated Joint Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to the Complaint and Modify Motion Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 7/30/2021. (jmr) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance Alicia A. Baiardo by Alicia A. Baiardo on behalf of Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Baiardo, Alicia)Attorney Alicia A. Baiardo added to party Wells Fargo & Company(pty:dft), Attorney Alicia A. Baiardo added to party Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.(pty:dft) (jmr). (Entered: 07/30/2021)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance of David C. Powell by David C. Powell on behalf of Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Powell, David)Attorney David C. Powell added to party Wells Fargo & Company(pty:dft), Attorney David C. Powell added to party Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.(pty:dft)(jmr). (Entered: 07/30/2021)

9 #1

[Proposed] Order Granting Stipulated Joint Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond

9 #9

Main Document

#8

(#8) ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. Case reassigned to Judge Larry Alan Burns and Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez for all further proceedings. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia, Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt no longer assigned to case. Create association to 3:18-cv-01388-LAB-LL. The new case number is 3:21-cv-01245-LAB-LL. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 7/16/2021. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 7/19/2021.(jrm) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Moshe Rotter on behalf of Thomas W. McNamara (Rotter, Jonathan)Attorney Jonathan Moshe Rotter added to party Thomas W. McNamara(pty:pla)(jrm). (Entered: 07/14/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Garth A. Spencer on behalf of Thomas W. McNamara (Spencer, Garth)Attorney Garth A. Spencer added to party Thomas W. McNamara(pty:pla) (jrm). (Entered: 07/14/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Cornelia J.B. Gordon on behalf of Thomas W. McNamara (Gordon, Cornelia)Attorney Cornelia J.B. Gordon added to party Thomas W. McNamara(pty:pla) (jrm). (Entered: 07/12/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Logan Daniel Smith on behalf of Thomas W. McNamara (Smith, Logan)Attorney Logan Daniel Smith added to party Thomas W. McNamara(pty:pla)(jrm). (Entered: 07/12/2021)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION to Dismiss Complaint with Prejudice by Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibit A to Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Exhibit B to Request for Judicial Notice, #5 Exhibit C to Request for Judicial Notice)(Baiardo, Alicia) (jmr). (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A... (Le, Anthony) (sjt). (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #9 Stipulated Joint Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to the Complaint and Modify Motion Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 7/30/2021. (jmr) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance Alicia A. Baiardo by Alicia A. Baiardo on behalf of Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Baiardo, Alicia)Attorney Alicia A. Baiardo added to party Wells Fargo & Company(pty:dft), Attorney Alicia A. Baiardo added to party Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.(pty:dft) (jmr). (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance of David C. Powell by David C. Powell on behalf of Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Powell, David)Attorney David C. Powell added to party Wells Fargo & Company(pty:dft), Attorney David C. Powell added to party Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.(pty:dft)(jmr). (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, Stipulated Joint Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to the Complaint and Modify Motion Briefing Schedule by Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order Granting Stipulated Joint Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to the Complaint and Modify Motion Briefing Schedule)(Le, Anthony)Attorney Anthony Q Le added to party Wells Fargo & Company(pty:dft), Attorney Anthony Q Le added to party Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.(pty:dft) QC Mailer, re: proposed order (jmr). (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. Case reassigned to Judge Larry Alan Burns and Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez for all further proceedings. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia, Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt no longer assigned to case. Create association to 3:18-cv-01388-LAB-LL. The new case number is 3:21-cv-01245-LAB-LL. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 7/16/2021. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 7/19/2021.(jrm) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Moshe Rotter on behalf of Thomas W. McNamara (Rotter, Jonathan)Attorney Jonathan Moshe Rotter added to party Thomas W. McNamara(pty:pla)(jrm). (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Garth A. Spencer on behalf of Thomas W. McNamara (Spencer, Garth)Attorney Garth A. Spencer added to party Thomas W. McNamara(pty:pla) (jrm). (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Cornelia J.B. Gordon on behalf of Thomas W. McNamara (Gordon, Cornelia)Attorney Cornelia J.B. Gordon added to party Thomas W. McNamara(pty:pla) (jrm). (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Logan Daniel Smith on behalf of Thomas W. McNamara (Smith, Logan)Attorney Logan Daniel Smith added to party Thomas W. McNamara(pty:pla)(jrm). (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (fth)(jrd) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Thomas W. McNamara of case(s) 18cv1388-LAB-LL. (fth) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-15907027.), filed by Thomas W. McNamara. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:21-cv-1245-AJB-JLB. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt are assigned to the case. (Glancy, Lionel) (fth) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alicia Anne Baiardo

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anthony Le

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Carlyle Powell