This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/01/2020 at 11:37:00 (UTC).

MCMURTRY et al v. CLEAN HARBORS ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 06/02/2020 MCMURTRY filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CLEAN HARBORS ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Esther Salas and Michael A. Hammer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-06774

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Esther Salas

Referral Judge

Michael A. Hammer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JOHNNIE STANLEY

WILLIAM MCMURTRY

Defendants

CLEAN HARBORS ES INDUSTRIAL SERVICES, INC.

AYIZAN DEREONCOURT

CLEAN HARBORS INDUSTRIAL SERVICES, INC.

CLEAN HARBORS ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES, INC.

CLEAN HARBORS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DAVID ZATUCHNI

Attorney at ZATUCHNI & ASSOCIATES, LLC

287 South Main Street

Lambertville, NJ 08530

BRUCE W. CLARK

Attorney at CLARK LAW OFFICES P.A.

103 Carnegie Center, Suite 300

Princeton, NJ 08540

CHRISTOPHER J. MICHIE

Attorney at CLARK MICHIE LLP

220 Alexander Street

Princeton, NJ 08540

Defendant Attorney

CAROLINE RILEY ROBB

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP

1717 Arch St., Suite 400

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#9

#8

6 #4

Certificate of Service

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1

#1

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketPro Hac Vice counsel, JAMES N. BOUDREAU, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (lag, ) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice James N. Boudreau to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-11055682.) (ROBB, CAROLINE) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to James N. Boudreau, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 6/30/2020. (ams, ) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL without Prejudice as to Clean Harbors Es Industrial Services, Inc. and Clean Harbons, Inc. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 6/24/2020. (ams, ) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by CLEAN HARBORS ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES, INC., CLEAN HARBORS INDUSTRIAL SERVICES, INC..(ROBB, CAROLINE) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendants Clean Harbors, Inc. and Clean Harbors ES Industrial Services, Inc. by WILLIAM MCMURTRY (MICHIE, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (ek) (Entered: 06/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • Docket(#10) TEXT ORDER: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 8/17/2020 at 2:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. The parties shall electronically file a joint discovery plan by 8/14/2020. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 6/18/2020. (jqb, ) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER J. MICHIE on behalf of All Plaintiffs (MICHIE, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by BRUCE W. CLARK on behalf of All Plaintiffs (CLARK, BRUCE) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 7/6/2020 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (lag, ) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk`s Text Order - The document #5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by CLEAN HARBORS ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES, INC., CLEAN HARBORS INDUSTRIAL SERVICES, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 6/23/2020. (lag, ) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by CLEAN HARBORS ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES, INC., CLEAN HARBORS INDUSTRIAL SERVICES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certification of Caroline R. Robb, Esq., #3 Certification of James N. Boudreau, Esq., #4 Certificate of Service)(ROBB, CAROLINE) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Attorney CAROLINE RILEY ROBB for CLEAN HARBORS ES INDUSTRIAL SERVICES, INC. added. (ROBB, CAROLINE) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AMENDED DOCUMENT by CLEAN HARBORS ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES, INC., CLEAN HARBORS ES INDUSTRIAL SERVICES, INC., CLEAN HARBORS INDUSTRIAL SERVICES, INC., CLEAN HARBORS, INC.. AMENDED CERTIFICATES OF SERVICE (DKT. 1, 2,3). (ROBB, CAROLINE) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (jr) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information - parties are to be entered in ALL CAPITAL letters. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jr) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Clean Harbors Industrial Services, Inc. identifying Clean Harbors, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (ROBB, CAROLINE) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by CLEAN HARBORS ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES, INC. identifying Clean Harbors, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (ROBB, CAROLINE) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CLEAN HARBORS ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES, INC. and Clean Harbors Industrial Services, Inc. from New Jersey Superior Court, case number MID-L-2435-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10890957), filed by CLEAN HARBORS ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(ROBB, CAROLINE) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where CLEAN HARBORS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc., a Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVID ZATUCHNI