This case was last updated from PACER on 01/11/2020 at 08:39:33 (UTC).

McMillon v. Unknown

Case Summary

On 11/12/2019 McMillon filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against Unknown. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-05115

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas W. Thrash, Jr

 

Party Details

Appellant

Robin McMillon

Smyrna, GA 30082

Debtor

Robin Florence Jean McMillon

Appellee

Unknown

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Order Doc. 23

1 #1

NOA Doc. 33

#3

(#3) Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Briefing Schedule to all parties. Appellants Brief due by 1/9/2020. (anc) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#2

(#2) BANKRUPTCY RECORD RECEIVED - DESIGNATED ITEMS NOT FILED (Lugo, Yahaira) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

1 #3

Docket Sheet

#1

(#1) Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal filed by Appellant, Robin McMillon, USBC Case#: 19-63741-sms. Notice of Appeal filed 11/08/2019 from Order entered 10/16/2019. Fee Paid: NO. (Attachments: #1 NOA Doc. 33, #2 Order Doc. 23, #3 Docket Sheet) (jap) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 11/15/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Robin McMillon re #3 Bankruptcy Appeal Briefing Schedule. (anc) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Briefing Schedule to all parties. Appellants Brief due by 1/9/2020. (anc) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) BANKRUPTCY RECORD RECEIVED - DESIGNATED ITEMS NOT FILED (Lugo, Yahaira) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • Filing Fee Paid: $ 298, receipt number 1259658 (anc) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Submission of #1 Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. for IFP review. (jap) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal filed by Appellant, Robin McMillon, USBC Case#: 19-63741-sms. Notice of Appeal filed 11/08/2019 from Order entered 10/16/2019. Fee Paid: NO. (Attachments: #1 NOA Doc. 33, #2 Order Doc. 23, #3 Docket Sheet) (jap) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.