This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/13/2023 at 09:11:34 (UTC).

McMillon et al v. DePuy Orthopaedics Inc et al

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 McMillon filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against DePuy Orthopaedics Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Cam Ferenbach and Richard F. Boulware, II. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00067

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Cam Ferenbach

Presiding Judge

Richard F. Boulware, II

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Deborah McMillon

Las Vegas, NV 89104

Richard McMillon

Las Vegas, NV 89104

Defendants

DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc.

DePuy Products, Inc.

Johnson & Johnson Inc.

Johnson & Johnson Services Inc

Special Master

Special Master

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Jessica D Miller

Attorney at Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

1440 New York Ave Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Robert R. McCoy

Attorney at Kaempfer Crowell

1980 Festival Plaza Drive, Suite 650

Las Vegas, NV 89135

Seth Michael Roberts

Attorney at Locke Lord Bissell & Liddell LLP

2200 Ross Avenue, Suite 2200

Dallas, TX 75204

Terri Bruksch

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg

11 S Meridian St

Indianapolis, IN 45204

Michael V Powell

Attorney at Locke Lord LLP

2200 Ross Avenue, Suite 2800

Dallas, TX 75201-6776

Special Master Attorney

James M Stanton-2244

Attorney at Stanton LLP

1717 Main Street, Suite 3800

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#51

(#51) NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING PRESTON P. REZAEE AND RYAN ALEXANDERS MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR PLAINTIFFS by Deborah McMillon, Richard McMillon.. (Alexander, Ryan) (Entered: 02/09/2023)

#50

(#50) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Robert R. McCoy on behalf of Defendants DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., DePuy Products, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Inc., Johnson & Johnson Services Inc. and Notice of Appearance by attorney Sihomara L. Graves (McCoy, Robert) (Entered: 01/30/2023)

#49

(#49) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/12/2023. This action was received on* 1/12/2023* pursuant to a court order directing transfer from the* Northern District of Texas* and assigned case number 2:23-cv-00067-RFB-VCF. All future documents must bear said correct case number. Verified Petition due by 1/26/2023. Joint Status Report due by 2/11/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

47 #1

*Restricted*

47 #47

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

#46

(#46) CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER: The attached order has been entered by the JPML in MDL 2244. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the actions on this conditional remand order be remanded to their respective transferor courts. (twd) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/12/2023.] (Entered: 01/12/2023)

45 #1

Exhibit(s) A - Docket List

45 #45

Main Document

#44

(#44) SUGGESTION OF REMAND ORDER - The Court issues this Suggestion of Remand to the United States Judicial Panel for Multidistrict Litigation (the "Panel") regarding seven cases pending in this MDL pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407(a). Pursuant to J.P.M.L. Rule 10.1(b)(i), the Court SUGGESTS that the Panel remand the identified seven cases to their transferor districts for further proceedings. The Clerk shall forward a certified copy of this order to the Panel. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 12/30/2022) (chmb) (chmb). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/12/2023.] (Entered: 12/30/2022)

7 #1

Cover Letter

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deborah McMillon, Richard McMillon re #3 Summons Issued. Johnson & Johnson served on 12/2/2013, answer due 12/23/2013. (Alexander, Ryan) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/31/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/12/2023.] (Entered: 12/06/2013)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deborah McMillon, Richard McMillon re #3 Summons Issued. DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc. served on 12/2/2013, answer due 12/23/2013. (Alexander, Ryan) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/31/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/12/2023.] (Entered: 12/05/2013)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Deborah McMillon that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. . (Alexander, Ryan) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/31/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/12/2023.] (Entered: 08/16/2013)

#3

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deborah McMillon, Richard McMillon re #3 Summons Issued. Johnson & Johnson served on 12/2/2013, answer due 12/23/2013. (Alexander, Ryan) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/31/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/12/2023.] (Entered: 12/06/2013)

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING PRESTON P. REZAEE AND RYAN ALEXANDERS MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR PLAINTIFFS by Deborah McMillon, Richard McMillon.. (Alexander, Ryan) (Entered: 02/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Robert R. McCoy on behalf of Defendants DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., DePuy Products, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Inc., Johnson & Johnson Services Inc. and Notice of Appearance by attorney Sihomara L. Graves (McCoy, Robert) (Entered: 01/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/12/2023. This action was received on* 1/12/2023* pursuant to a court order directing transfer from the* Northern District of Texas* and assigned case number 2:23-cv-00067-RFB-VCF. All future documents must bear said correct case number. Verified Petition due by 1/26/2023. Joint Status Report due by 2/11/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • Docket(#48) STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (KF) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) Case transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:13-cv-05060. Original file with transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER: The attached order has been entered by the JPML in MDL 2244. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the actions on this conditional remand order be remanded to their respective transferor courts. (twd) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/12/2023.] (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) STATUS REPORT (defendants) filed by DePuy Orthopaedics Inc, DePuy Products Inc, Johnson & Johnson Inc, Johnson & Johnson Services Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Docket List) (Bruksch, Terri) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/12/2023.] (Entered: 01/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • Docket***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:41,42,43,44. Fri Dec 30 13:27:56 CST 2022 (crt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/12/2023.] (Entered: 12/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) SUGGESTION OF REMAND ORDER - The Court issues this Suggestion of Remand to the United States Judicial Panel for Multidistrict Litigation (the "Panel") regarding seven cases pending in this MDL pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407(a). Pursuant to J.P.M.L. Rule 10.1(b)(i), the Court SUGGESTS that the Panel remand the identified seven cases to their transferor districts for further proceedings. The Clerk shall forward a certified copy of this order to the Panel. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 12/30/2022) (chmb) (chmb). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/12/2023.] (Entered: 12/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 12/30/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-160). Signed by MDL Panel on 12/30/13. (Attachments: #1 Minute Order)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/31/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/12/2023.] (Entered: 12/30/2013)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #1 Complaint, ; by Defendants DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (McCoy, Robert) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/31/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/12/2023.] (Entered: 12/23/2013)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF RELATED CASES by Defendant DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(SLR) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/31/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/12/2023.] (Entered: 12/16/2013)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deborah McMillon, Richard McMillon re #3 Summons Issued. Johnson & Johnson served on 12/2/2013, answer due 12/23/2013. (Alexander, Ryan) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/31/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/12/2023.] (Entered: 12/06/2013)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deborah McMillon, Richard McMillon re #3 Summons Issued. DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc. served on 12/2/2013, answer due 12/23/2013. (Alexander, Ryan) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/31/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/12/2023.] (Entered: 12/05/2013)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Deborah McMillon that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. . (Alexander, Ryan) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/31/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/12/2023.] (Entered: 08/16/2013)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., Johnson & Johnson re #1 Complaint. (MAJ) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/31/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/12/2023.] (Entered: 08/12/2013)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service. (no image attached) (MAJ) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/31/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/12/2023.] (Entered: 08/12/2013)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. (MAJ) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/31/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/12/2023.] (Entered: 08/12/2013)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-2921303), filed by Deborah McMillon, Richard McMillon. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 8/19/2013. Proof of service due by 12/7/2013. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (Alexander, Ryan) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/31/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/12/2023.] (Entered: 08/09/2013)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less