This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/28/2021 at 07:14:54 (UTC).

MCMILLION v. OS RESTAURANT SERVICES, LLC, d/b/a BONEFISH GRILL

Case Summary

On 04/29/2021 MCMILLION filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against OS RESTAURANT SERVICES, LLC, d/b/a BONEFISH GRILL. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01976

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BERNADETTE MCMILLION

Defendant

OS RESTAURANT SERVICES, LLC, d/b/a BONEFISH GRILL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARY E. LEMIEUX-FILLERY

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF ERIC A SHORE PC

Two Penn Center Suite 1240, 1500 John F Kennedy Blvd

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit "A"

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit "B"

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet

1 #4

Designation Form Designation Form

#2

#3

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STIPULATION To Amend Caption by BERNADETTE MCMILLION. (LEMIEUX-FILLERY, MARY) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BERNADETTE MCMILLION. OS RESTAURANT SERVICES, LLC, d/b/a BONEFISH GRILL waiver sent on 4/29/2021, answer due 6/28/2021. (LEMIEUX-FILLERY, MARY) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued as to OS RESTAURANT SERVICES, LLC, d/b/a BONEFISH GRILL. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 4/29/21 (bw, ) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by BERNADETTE MCMILLION. (fb) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15086101.), filed by BERNADETTE MCMILLION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit Exhibit "B", #3 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #4 Designation Form Designation Form)(LEMIEUX-FILLERY, MARY) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OS RESTAURANT SERVICES LLC DOING BUSINESS AS CARRABBA'S ITALIAN GRILL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARY E. LEMIEUX-FILLERY