This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/19/2022 at 07:56:12 (UTC).

MCMILLAN v. SOLAR AND ENERGY LOAN FUND OF ST. LUCIE COUNTY, INC.

Case Summary

On 02/18/2022 MCMILLAN filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against SOLAR AND ENERGY LOAN FUND OF ST LUCIE COUNTY, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Aileen M. Cannon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-14070

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Aileen M. Cannon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LIRIA MCMILLAN

Defendant

SOLAR AND ENERGY LOAN FUND OF ST. LUCIE COUNTY, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew William Birk

Attorney at the law office of matthew birk, llc

309 Ne 1St Street

Gainesville, FL 32601

Defendant Attorney

Laurie Ann Thompson

Attorney at Fowler White Burnett

515 N. Flagler Drive, Suite 2100

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summon(s)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to SOLAR AND ENERGY LOAN FUND OF ST. LUCIE COUNTY, INC. (scn) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

#4

(#4) Order in Actions Brought under the Fair Labor Standards Act. ( Statement of Claim due by 3/11/2022.), Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard for Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 2/22/2022. See attached document for full details. (ls) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

#5

(#5) Statement of: Claim by LIRIA MCMILLAN re #4 Order of Requirements,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, (Birk, Matthew) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

#6

(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT against SOLAR AND ENERGY LOAN FUND OF ST. LUCIE COUNTY, INC., filed by LIRIA MCMILLAN.(Birk, Matthew) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

7 #7

Main Document

7 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#8

(#8) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by LIRIA MCMILLAN. SOLAR AND ENERGY LOAN FUND OF ST. LUCIE COUNTY, INC. served on 3/10/2022, response/answer due 3/31/2022. (Birk, Matthew) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

#10

(#10) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint by SOLAR AND ENERGY LOAN FUND OF ST. LUCIE COUNTY, INC.. (Thompson, Laurie) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint by SOLAR AND ENERGY LOAN FUND OF ST. LUCIE COUNTY, INC.. (Thompson, Laurie) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • DocketSet/Reset Response/Answer Due Deadline per paperless order DE# 9 : SOLAR AND ENERGY LOAN FUND OF ST. LUCIE COUNTY, INC. response/answer due 4/20/2022. (drz) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Defendant shall file a response to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint on or before April 20, 2022. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 3/30/2022. (jrt) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by LIRIA MCMILLAN. SOLAR AND ENERGY LOAN FUND OF ST. LUCIE COUNTY, INC. served on 3/10/2022, response/answer due 3/31/2022. (Birk, Matthew) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to Response to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint re #6 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal by SOLAR AND ENERGY LOAN FUND OF ST. LUCIE COUNTY, INC.. Attorney Laurie Ann Thompson added to party SOLAR AND ENERGY LOAN FUND OF ST. LUCIE COUNTY, INC.(pty:dft). Responses due by 4/12/2022 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Thompson, Laurie) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT against SOLAR AND ENERGY LOAN FUND OF ST. LUCIE COUNTY, INC., filed by LIRIA MCMILLAN.(Birk, Matthew) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Statement of: Claim by LIRIA MCMILLAN re #4 Order of Requirements,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, (Birk, Matthew) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order in Actions Brought under the Fair Labor Standards Act. ( Statement of Claim due by 3/11/2022.), Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard for Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 2/22/2022. See attached document for full details. (ls) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to SOLAR AND ENERGY LOAN FUND OF ST. LUCIE COUNTY, INC. (scn) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Aileen M. Cannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (scn) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against SOLAR AND ENERGY LOAN FUND OF ST. LUCIE COUNTY, INC.. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15413464, filed by LIRIA MCMILLAN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Birk, Matthew) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOLAR AND ENERGY LOAN FUND (SELF) is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Laurie Ann Thompson